Dorn v. Jefferson County Court et al
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Dorn
Defendant: Jefferson County Court and City of Denver
Case Number: 1:2019cv01627
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to City of Denver on 10/16/2019; Jefferson County Court on 10/16/2019. Summons mailed to plaintiff.(sam)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT For F.R.Civ.P. 4 filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (nmg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION to produce social security card, passport, and birth certificate - filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (amf)
September 12, 2019 Remark: Rule 4 mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff. (nmg)
September 12, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number DEX032368. (nmg)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, denying request to proceed informa pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30-days or the case shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/5/2019. (kmd)
September 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Request/motion to censor Judges in Colorado and New York. (lak)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT - filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against City of Denver, Jefferson County Court - filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Thomas J. Dorn. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorn v. Jefferson County Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?