Coppedge et al v. Charlton et al
Plaintiff: Krisha M. Coppedge, Krisha Johnson and James Coppedge
Defendant: Esq. Kristi J. Doughty, McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC, U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, Esq. Janet Z. Carlton, U.S. Bank, N.A., Michael B. Joseph and Janet Z. Charlton
Case Number: 1:2019cv01640
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re #25 Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit, filed by Krisha M. Coppedge, James Coppedge. USCA Case Number 19-3384. USCA Case Manager: Caitlyn (CJG) (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (cg1)
October 17, 2019 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST - filed by James Coppedge. TRANSCRIPT NOT NEEDED. (amf)
October 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Third Circuit of D.I #24 Memorandum and Order,,,, Terminated Case,,,. Appeal filed by James Coppedge, Krisha M. Coppedge. Filing fee $505, receipt number DEX032513. TPO Provided. (Attachments: #1 Order 10.02.2019, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(mal)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re #1 Complaint, #22 MOTION to Stay, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #20 MOTION to Seal, #6 MEMORANDUM in Support, #19 MOTION to Seal, #23 MOTION to Stay - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) The Emergency Motions for Permanent Preliminary Injunction Against Unlawful Foreclosure Attempts (D.I. 1, 5, 6) are DENIED; (2) The unopposed Motions to Seal (D.I. 19, 20) are GRANTED SOLELY TO THE EXTENT that those documents may currently remain under seal; (3) The Motion for Extraordinary Emergency Relief (D.I. 22) and Motion for Extraordinary Stay (D.I. 23) are DENIED; and (4) The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE this case. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/2/2019. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Debtors/Movants on 10/3/2019*** (dlw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extraordinary Stay - filed by James Coppedge, Krisha M. Coppedge. (kmd) (Main Document 23 replaced on 9/30/2019) (kmd). (Main Document 23 replaced (redacted) on 9/30/2019) (kmd).
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION FOR EXTRAORDINARY EMERGENCY RELIEF FOR STAY OF THE PROCEEDING - filed by James Coppedge, Krisha M. Coppedge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Verification of James Coppedge, #3 Verification of Krisha Coppedge)(rwc)
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by James Coppedge, Krisha M. Coppedge. (lak)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal and in Further Support of D.I. #5 - filed by Krisha M. Coppedge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(nmg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal and in Further Support of D.I. #5 - filed by James Coppedge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(nmg)
September 24, 2019 Remark: Copies of D.I. #15 and #16 were received and sent to case file. (nmg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 THIRD MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by James Coppedge. (amf)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Janet Z. Charlton.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Appendix to Respondent's Response to Movant's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Charlton, Janet)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Coppedge. Janet Z. Charlton C/O Corporate Trust Center served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (nmg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Coppedge. Janet Z. Charlton served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (nmg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION to Foreclosure Sale in Further Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by James Coppedge. (nmg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 Letter to James and Krisha Coppedge from Clerk's Office returning unclear documents received in the District Court on 9/12/2019. (amf)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FOR F.R.Civ.P. 4. Acknowledgment filed by Krisha M. Coppedge. (myr)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT - filed against Janet Z. Charlton and voluntarily dismissing other defendants- filed by James Coppedge.(rwc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT for F.R.Civ.P. 4. Acknowledgment filed by James Coppedge. (myr)
September 16, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Janet Z. Charlton on 9/10/2019.
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Briefing Schedule for Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Janet Z. Charlton re 7 Oral Order,,, Set Briefing Schedule,, (Charlton, Janet)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 SECOND MEMORANDUM in Support re D.I. #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by James Coppedge.(amf)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall file their answering brief(s) to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before 9/20/2019 (Set Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 9/20/2019). A copy of this Oral Order has been emailed to Janet Z. Charlton, Esquire with the request that Ms. Charlton forward to all other defendants. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/12/2019. ***Copy mailed to pro se plaintiffs 9/12/2019*** (dlw)
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of D.I. #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by James Coppedge. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/24/2019. (sam)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by James Coppedge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(sam)
September 10, 2019 Remark: Rule 4 mailed to Plaintiff on 9/10/2019 for signature. (amf)
September 10, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number DEX032339. (amf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend error in name spelling - filed by James Coppedge. (lak)
September 4, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to James Coppedge from Bob Cruikshank returning check/money order. (kmd)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Leave for Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals, Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4, 60(b), 5, 12(b), 6(1)(2) Due to Fraud Upon the Court Against the Secured Party...Motion for Permanent Preliminary Injunction Against Unlawful Foreclosure Attempts "Notice of Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals from a Judgment or Order of a District Court or a Bankruptcy Appellant Panel." against Janet Z. Carlton, Kristi J. Doughty, Michael B. Joseph, McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Krisha M. Coppedge, James Coppedge. (Filing Fee Money Order Returned for Incorrect Amount - See Letter)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coppedge et al v. Charlton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krisha M. Coppedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krisha Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Coppedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Kristi J. Doughty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Janet Z. Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Z. Charlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?