Henderson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kristan Henderson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01666
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER - Within ninety (90) days from the date of this Order, the Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of the Social Security proceedings. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/24/2019. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 9/24/2019*** (dlw)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/12/2019. (amf)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Benderson, Heather)
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Commissioner of Social Security - filed by Kristan Henderson. (*IFP pending) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Kristan Henderson. (amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristan Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?