Ferrara v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Ferrara
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv01668
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeff T. Seldomridge, filed by Christopher Ferrara. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/3/2019. (nms)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeff T. Seldomridge - filed by Christopher Ferrara. (Warner, Raeann)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORAL ORDER: The Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeff T. Seldomridge (D.I. #13 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renew. Certifications by counsel need to be dated as to the day they were signed. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/2/2019. (nms)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeff T. Seldomridge - filed by Christopher Ferrara. (Warner, Raeann)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SO ORDERED Granting #11 Joint Stipulation and Order Requesting Stay of All Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/27/2019. (nms)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION and Order Requesting Stay of All Proceedings by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Brown, Lisa)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Zwally Brown on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Brown, Lisa)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Raeann Warner on behalf of Christopher Ferrara (Warner, Raeann)
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of of Filing Submission Regarding Remand or Transfer of Certain Cases. Designation of Record. (rwc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER - signed by the Honorable David G. Campbell on 8/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Certified Bard MDL Docket Sheet) (rwc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/9/2019. (lak)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Record of case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number in Other District: 2:18-cv-00475. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
September 6, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to District of Delaware via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re #3 . Signed By Judge David G. Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
February 12, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-475-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
February 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15154925 filed by Christopher Ferrara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrara v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Lisa Zwally Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Lisa Zwally Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ferrara
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?