Allergan USA, Inc. et al v. Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Allergan USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica NV, Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company and Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01674
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 2, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. answer due 12/2/2019; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. answer due 12/2/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/30/2019. (nms)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 2, 2019 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV: For Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 9, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. on 9/9/2019; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. on 9/9/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceutica NV; Corporate Parent Allergan plc for Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Allergan USA, Inc. filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Allergan USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (myr)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) See Attached. (myr)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: On or after 7/31/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: On or after 11/27/2022. (myr)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2725571.) - filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allergan USA, Inc. et al v. Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janssen Pharmaceutica NV
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?