Maloney v. City of Milford et al
Plaintiff: Shelley Maloney
Defendant: Officer Timothy Lord and City of Milford
Case Number: 1:2019cv01675
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shelley Maloney: For City of Milford waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Stanley, Joseph)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shelley Maloney: For Timothy Lord waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Stanley, Joseph)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Helene Elizabeth Episcopo on behalf of All Defendants (Episcopo, Helene)
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 9, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against City of Milford, Timothy Lord - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2725600.) - filed by Shelley Maloney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maloney v. City of Milford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Timothy Lord
Represented By: Helene Elizabeth Episcopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Milford
Represented By: Helene Elizabeth Episcopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Maloney
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?