Citron v. EZTD INC
Petitioner: Shimon Citron
Respondent: EZTD INC and EZTD INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01676
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by EZTD INC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/4/2019. (fms)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re SO ORDERED, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s), #1 Complaint to November 7, 2019 - filed by EZTD INC. (Townsend, Ethan)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by EZTD INC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: EZTD INC answer due 11/7/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/24/2019. (fms)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, SO ORDERED, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s) November 7, 2019 - filed by EZTD INC. (Townsend, Ethan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison S. Carpenter on behalf of EZTD INC (Carpenter, Harrison)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Haller Townsend on behalf of EZTD INC (Townsend, Ethan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley R. Altschuler on behalf of EZTD INC (Altschuler, Ashley)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Petition to October 24, 2019 filed by EZTD INC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: EZTD INC answer due 10/24/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/16/2019. (fms)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Petition to October 24, 2019 - filed by EZTD INC. (Altschuler, Ashley)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Ian Platz re Writ Issued filed by Shimon Citron. (Hiller, Adam)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Shimon Citron. EZTD INC served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Hiller, Adam)
September 23, 2019 WRIT of Attachment and Execution issued (nmf)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SO ORDERED, re #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of Garnishment Motion for Writ of Attachment and Execution filed by Shimon Citron. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/23/2019. (nmf)
September 16, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to filing party on 9/16/2019. (lak)
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Amended EXHIBIT 1 to Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of Writ of Attachment by Shimon Citron. (Hiller, Adam)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of Garnishment Motion for Writ of Attachment and Execution - filed by Shimon Citron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hiller, Adam)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint Verification of Complaint by Shimon Citron. (Hiller, Adam)
September 9, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to EZTD INC on 9/9/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT - filed against EZTD INC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2725936.) - filed by Shimon Citron. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citron v. EZTD INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: EZTD INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: EZTD INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shimon Citron
Represented By: Adam Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?