Shaer v. Straehla et al
Plaintiff: Mohammad Shaer
Defendant: Paul V. Heerwagen IV, Mark Layton, Arthur Amron, Arthur Smith, Wexford Capital LP, Marc McCarthy, Arty Straehla, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Jim Palm and Matthew Ross
Nominal Defendant: Mammoth Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01683
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mammoth Energy Services, Inc. (see D.I. #7 Request for Default filed by Mohammad Shaer). (nms)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Michael J. Farnan, regarding status. (Farnan, Michael) Modified on 10/15/2019 (nms).
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Default as to Mammoth Energy Services, Inc. - filed by Mohammad Shaer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER: Defendant Mammoth Energy Service, Inc.'s answer was due to be filed on 10/1/2019 (see D.I. #3 ), and to date none has been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/10/2019. (nms)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Timothy Brown re #4 MOTION for Consolidation and Appointment of Co-Lead and Local Counsel, by Aaron Randall, Mohammad Shaer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 9/18/2019 (nms).
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Consolidation and Appointment of Co-Lead and Local Counsel - filed by Aaron Randall, Mohammad Shaer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian)
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01682-RGA, 1:19-cv-01683-RGA (rjb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammad Shaer. Mammoth Energy Services, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Farnan, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Mammoth Energy Services, Inc. on 9/10/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Arthur Amron, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Paul V. Heerwagen IV, Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services, Inc., Marc McCarthy, Jim Palm, Matthew Ross, Arthur Smith, Arty Straehla, Wexford Capital LP - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2726609.) - filed by Mohammad Shaer. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaer v. Straehla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul V. Heerwagen IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Layton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Amron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Capital LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arty Straehla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfport Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Palm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Mammoth Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Shaer
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?