Aquino v. Berkshire Hathaway Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rueben Aquino
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Berkshire Hathaway Inc. and Trans Union, LLC,
Case Number: 1:2019cv01684
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rueben Aquino as to Berkshire Hathaway Inc. d/b/a RC Willey Home Furnishings (Garibian, Antranig)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/16/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/17/2019. (nmf)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to November 8, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/9/2019. (fms)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to November 8, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC,.(Bennett, Blake)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement as to Berkshire Hathaway Inc. d/b/a RC Willey Home Furnishings Only by Rueben Aquino (Garibian, Antranig)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rueben Aquino. Berkshire Hathaway Inc. served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rueben Aquino. Trans Union, LLC, served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rueben Aquino. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
September 27, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Debra A. Miller for Trans Union, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Debra A. Miller filed by Trans Union, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/25/2019. (fms)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Debra A. Miller - filed by Trans Union, LLC,. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC, filed by Trans Union, LLC,. (Bennett, Blake)
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 10, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to Philadelphia Office per filing party's request. (myr)
September 10, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Berkshire Hathaway Inc. on 9/10/2019; Equifax Information Services, LLC on 9/10/2019; Trans Union, LLC, on 9/10/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2726711.) - filed by Rueben Aquino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aquino v. Berkshire Hathaway Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rueben Aquino
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?