Aviles v. Ladd et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Aviles
Defendant: Robert B. Ladd, Michael Onghai and Robert Holmes
Nominal Defendant: MGT Capital Investments, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01700
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORAL ORDER: The request for an extension of time (D.I. #8 ) is GRANTED (*Reset Answer Deadlines: H. Robert Holmes answer due 12/13/2019; Robert B. Ladd answer due 12/13/2019; MGT Capital Investments, Inc. answer due 12/13/2019; Michael Onghai answer due 12/13/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/28/2019. (nms)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by Arthur Aviles. (Bennett, Blake)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER: Defendants' answers were due to be filed on 10/15/2019 (see D.I. #3 , #4 , #5 , and #6 ), and to date none have been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/21/2019. (nms)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Aviles. Michael Onghai served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Aviles. H. Robert Holmes served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Aviles. Robert B. Ladd served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Aviles. MGT Capital Investments, Inc. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 23, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to H. Robert Holmes; Robert B. Ladd; MGT Capital Investments; and Michael Onghai on 9/23/2019. (*2 copies of each summons issued) (amf)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 11, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Stockholder Derivative COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Robert Holmes, Robert B. Ladd, MGT Capital Investments, Inc., Michael Onghai - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2728501.) - filed by Arthur Aviles. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviles v. Ladd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: MGT Capital Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B. Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Onghai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Aviles
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?