Bavaro v. Polymeropoulos, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Bavaro
Defendant: Kenneth Bate, Vincent J. Milano, H. Thomas Watkins, Michael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Richard W. Dugan, Gian Piero Reverberi, James Kelly, Michael F. Cola and Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D.
Nominal Defendant: Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01701
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mason, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings by Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. Thomas Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Mason, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings filed by Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. Thomas Watkins.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/14/2019. (Mason, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings - filed by Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. Thomas Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Local Rule 7.1.1 Certification)(Mason, Daniel)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to December 16, 2019 filed by Gian Piero Reverberi, James Kelly, Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, H. Thomas Watkins, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Vincent J. Milano, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Richard W. Dugan, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Kenneth Bate answer due 12/16/2019; Michael F. Cola answer due 12/16/2019; Richard W. Dugan answer due 12/16/2019; James Kelly answer due 12/16/2019; Vincent J. Milano answer due 12/16/2019; Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D. answer due 12/16/2019; Gian Piero Reverberi answer due 12/16/2019; Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 12/16/2019; H. Thomas Watkins answer due 12/16/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/9/2019. (fms)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to December 16, 2019 - filed by Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. Thomas Watkins. (Mason, Daniel)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. James Kelly served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Gian Piero Reverberi served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. H. Thomas Watkins served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Michael F. Cola served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Richard W. Dugan served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Vincent J. Milano served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Kenneth Bate served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 23, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Kenneth Bate on 9/11/2019; Michael F. Cola on 9/11/2019; Richard W. Dugan on 9/11/2019; James Kelly on 9/11/2019; Vincent J. Milano on 9/11/2019; Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D. on 9/11/2019; Gian Piero Reverberi on 9/11/2019; Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 9/11/2019; H. Thomas Watkins on 9/11/2019 (*2 Copies of summons were issued for each Defendant). (myr)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 11, 2019 No Summons Issued. (lak)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, H. Thomas Watkins - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2728550.) - filed by Michael Bavaro. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/12/2019) (kmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bavaro v. Polymeropoulos, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Bate
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent J. Milano
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Thomas Watkins
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Dugan
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gian Piero Reverberi
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kelly
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Cola
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D.
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bavaro
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?