Brown et al v. United Reefer Services, S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Alan D. Brown and Sylvia Elizabeth Lucas Brown and Alan D. Brown
Defendant: United Reefer Services, S.A. and M/V CHIQUITA EXPRESS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01706
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Alan D. Brown, Alan D. Brown and Sylvia Elizabeth Lucas Brown: For United Reefer Services, S.A. waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Rowe, Kelly)
September 27, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, D.I. #3 has been removed from the docket and will be refiled shortly using the correct docket event. (fms)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 13, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to filing party's office per request 9/13/2019. (lak)
September 12, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to M/V CHIQUITA EXPRESS and United Reefer Services, S.A. on 9/12/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against M/V CHIQUITA EXPRESS, United Reefer Services, S.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2728991.) - filed by Alan D. Brown and Sylvia Elizabeth Lucas Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. United Reefer Services, S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan D. Brown and Sylvia Elizabeth Lucas Brown
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan D. Brown
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Reefer Services, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V CHIQUITA EXPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?