In re: Center City Healthcare, LLC, et al.
Appellee: Thomas Jefferson University Hospitals, Inc. and Center City Healthcare, LLC
Appellant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01711
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 37 JOINDER by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, joining in #33 Appellee's Brief . (Horan, Thomas)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/6/2019. (nms)
November 6, 2019 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply - filed by United States of America. (Sacks, Marcus) Modified on 11/6/2019 (nms).
November 5, 2019 Filing 35 JOINDER in #33 Appellee's Brief, by Thomas Jefferson University Hospitals, Inc., by Thomas Jefferson University Hospitals, Inc., (Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 11/6/2019 (nms).
November 5, 2019 Filing 34 APPENDIX re #33 Appellee's Brief by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Minuti, Mark)
November 5, 2019 Filing 33 Appellee's BRIEF by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Minuti, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Filing 32 APPENDIX re #31 Appellant's Brief by United States of America. (Sacks, Marcus)
October 22, 2019 Filing 31 Appellant's BRIEF by United States of America. (Sacks, Marcus)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #23 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Appellees' schedule for briefing is ADOPTED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2019. (nms)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The Emergency Motion to Extend Status Quo Provisions of Sale Order or, in the Alternative, for Reconsideration or Modification of the Order Granting Stay Pending Appeal (D.I. #20 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/4/2019. (nms)
October 4, 2019 Filing 28 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Richard A. Barkasy, Esq., regarding letter from Counsel for Center City Healthcare to Court dated October 4, 2019. (Pereira, Daniel) Modified on 10/8/2019 (nms).
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Mark Minuti, Counsel for Center City Healthcare, regarding Emergency Motion to Extend Status Quo for Sale Order (D.I. #20 ). (Minuti, Mark) Modified on 10/4/2019 (nms).
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #20 Emergency Motion to Extend Status Quo Provisions of Sale Order or, in the Alternative, for Reconsideration or Modification of the Order Granting Stay Pending Appeal filed by United States of America.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sacks, Marcus)
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #20 Emergency Motion to Extend Status Quo Provisions of Sale Order or, in the Alternative, for Reconsideration or Modification of the Order Granting Stay Pending Appeal filed by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Health.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pereira, Daniel)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 JOINDER to #20 Emergency Motion to Extend Status Quo Provisions of Sale Order or, in the Alternative, for Reconsideration or Modification of the Order Granting Stay Pending Appeal, filed by Thomas Jefferson University Hospitals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 10/3/2019 (nms).
October 3, 2019 Filing 23 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/3/19. (cak)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORAL ORDER: A response to the Emergency Motion to Extend Status Quo Provisions of Sale Order or, in the Alternative, for Reconsideration or Modification of the Order Granting Stay Pending Appeal (D.I. #20 ) is due no later than COB on 10/3/2019. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/2/2019. (nms)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 JOINDER in #20 Emergency Motion to Extend Status Quo Provisions of Sale Order or, in the Alternative, for Reconsideration or Modification of the Order Granting Stay Pending Appeal, by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Horan, Thomas) Modified on 10/1/2019 (nms).
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 Emergency Motion to Extend Status Quo Provisions of Sale Order or, in the Alternative, for Reconsideration or Modification of the Order Granting Stay Pending Appeal - filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Minuti, Mark) Modified on 10/1/2019 (nms).
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal, filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Applebaum, Aaron) Modified on 10/1/2019 (nms).
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 STATEMENT of Issues on Appeal and Designation of Record, filed by United States of America.(Sacks, Marcus) Modified on 9/26/2019 (nms).
September 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 16, 2019 Remark : Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment. (rwc)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #4 Emergency Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States' Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal is GRANTED. The Bankruptcy Court's Sale Order is STAYED pending final resolution of the United States' appeal of that Sale Order. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/16/2019. (dlw)
September 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Telephone Conference held on 9/16/2019 regarding the Emergency Motion to Stay Sale Order Pending Appeal ( #4 ). (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) (mdb)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew H. Sherman, #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Boris I. Mankovetskiy filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/16/2019. (dlw)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Boris I. Mankovetskiy - filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Horan, Thomas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew H. Sherman - filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Horan, Thomas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Regarding the Debtors' Response in Opposition to the United States' Filing of Emergency Motion for Temporary Administrative Stay and Petition for Mandamus by Center City Healthcare, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Objection)(DiSabatino, Monique)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Sale Order pending Appeal, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sacks, Marcus) Modified on 9/16/2019 (dlw). Modified on 9/16/2019 (dlw). Modified on 9/25/2019 (nms).
September 14, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Sale Order pending Appeal filed by Thomas Jefferson University Hospitals, Inc. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 9/15/2019 (dlw).
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing of emergency motion in the Third Circuit by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Emergency Motion in the Third Circuit)(Sacks, Marcus) Modified on 9/14/2019 (dlw).
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 JOINDER by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, joining in #5 Answering Brief in Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Horan, Thomas) Modified on 9/14/2019 (dlw).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORAL ORDER - In light of Appellant's Response to Oral Order #8 and the representations made therein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellant's reply brief is due no later than 10:00 AM on 9/16/2019 and the teleconference is RESET for 9/16/2019 at 4:00 PM. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/13/2019. (dlw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Order re 7 Oral Order // Notice of Correcting Stay Motion and Requesting Amended Teleconference Time filed by United States of America. (Sacks, Marcus) Modified on 9/13/2019 (dlw).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before NOON on 9/16/2019, Appellant shall file a reply in further support of its Emergency Motion #4 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, with the understanding that the sale can close as early as 9/18/2019 as represented in the Emergency Motion (see D.I. 4 Paragraph 17), a teleconference is set for 11:00 AM on 9/17/2019. Any party wishing to join the call shall do so by individually dialing into 302-573-4545 not earlier than 10:55 AM. If the sale may close before 9/18/2019, the parties shall IMMEDIATELY notify the Court. (Set Briefing Schedule: re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Sale Order pending Appeal - Reply Brief due by NOON 9/16/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/13/2019. (dlw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 APPENDIX re #5 Answering Brief in Opposition to Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Tab 1, #2 Tab 2, #3 Tab 3, #4 Tab 4, #5 Tab 5, #6 Tab 6, #7 Tab 7, #8 Tab 8, #9 Tab 9, #10 Tab 10)(DiSabatino, Monique) Modified on 9/13/2019 (dlw).
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Sale Order pending Appeal filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. Reply Brief due date per Court Order is 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Allen Wilen, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DiSabatino, Monique) Modified on 9/13/2019 (dlw).
September 12, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (kmd)
September 12, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (kmd)
September 12, 2019 Remark : Case submitted to Duty Judge (MN) for review. Counsel for the United States shall provide one courtesy copy of all documents submitted under DI 4 to the Clerk's Office as soon as practicable. (rwc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Sale Order pending Appeal - filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Affidavit Declaration in support of emergency motion for stay, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit Notice of Appeal)(Sacks, Marcus) Modified on 9/13/2019 (dlw).
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Thursday, September 25, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/12/19. (cak)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (kmd)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 9/10/2019 by Judge Kevin Gross in Bankruptcy case number 19-11466-KG. Fee Status Waived.- filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Center City Healthcare, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas Jefferson University Hospitals, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A. Jackson
Represented By: Joseph N. Argentina, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Center City Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Monique Bair DiSabatino
Represented By: Mark Minuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Marcus S. Sacks
Represented By: Ellen W. Slights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?