Cabaret Biotech Ltd. v. Kite Pharma, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cabaret Biotech Ltd.
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Kite Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01732
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than November 22, 2019. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, New Patent Procedures). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/8/19. (ntl)
November 8, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. 16 per request of counsel. (ntl)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request to start the process leading to a scheduling order and conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/8/2019) (ntl).
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #13 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Cabaret Biotech Ltd. by Kite Pharma, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Cabaret Biotech Ltd..(Keller, Karen)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Cabaret Biotech Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Keller, Karen)
October 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Eric A. Stone, Jennifer Gordon, Naz Erdeniz Wehrli, Tanya S. Manno for Cabaret Biotech Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric A. Stone, Jennifer Gordon, Naz Wehrli and Tanya S. Manno filed by Cabaret Biotech Ltd.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/17/2019. (etg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter (Count II of Complaint) MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, (Jury Demand) filed by Cabaret Biotech Ltd.. (Keller, Karen)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric A. Stone, Jennifer Gordon, Naz Wehrli and Tanya S. Manno - filed by Cabaret Biotech Ltd.. (Keller, Karen)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David B. Bassett, Vinita Ferrera, Emily R. Whelan, and Shirley X. Li Cantin filed by Kite Pharma, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/10/2019. (etg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David B. Bassett, Vinita Ferrera, Emily R. Whelan, and Shirley X. Li Cantin - filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., Kite Pharma, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Gilead Sciences, Inc. for Kite Pharma, Inc. filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., Kite Pharma, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Cabaret Biotech Ltd. by Kite Pharma, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter (Count II of Complaint) MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, (Jury Demand) filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., Kite Pharma, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/15/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter (Count II of Complaint), MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, (Jury Demand) - filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., Kite Pharma, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 16, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Gilead Sciences, Inc. on 9/16/2019; Kite Pharma, Inc. on 9/16/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cabaret Biotech Ltd.. (kmd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,741,465 BL. (kmd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Declaratory Judgment that the '465 Patent is Not Invalid filed with Jury Demand against Gilead Sciences, Inc., Kite Pharma, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2731318.) - filed by Cabaret Biotech Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabaret Biotech Ltd. v. Kite Pharma, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kite Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cabaret Biotech Ltd.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Jennifer Gordon
Represented By: Tanya S. Manno
Represented By: Naz Erdeniz Wehrli
Represented By: Eric A. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?