Brokaw v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Jay Brokaw
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01769
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Remark : Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-07395, filed 11/08/2019. (rwc)
November 7, 2019 Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California. (ntl)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-164) re MDL No. 2741. (ntl)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Brokaw. Monsanto Company served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Bifferato, Ian)
September 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 20, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Monsanto Company on 9/20/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Monsanto Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2736140.) - filed by Jay Brokaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brokaw v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Brokaw
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?