Chase v. Metzger et al
Plaintiff: DeShawn Chase
Defendant: Dana Metzger and Attorney General of the State of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2019cv01771
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 AEDPA Election Form filed by petitioner and requesting to amend 2254 to include all grounds within 30 days. (lak)
October 30, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #5 resent to plaintiff result of clerical error. (sam)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, granting request to proceed informa pauperis and notifying petitioner that AEDPA applies to petition. Petitioner must file attached election form with the court. (Copy to pet. with Mag. Consent Form & AEDPA Form)( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/25/2019.) Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/24/2019. (sam)
September 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by DeShawn Chase.(mal)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Trust Fund Account Statement by DeShawn Chase (mal)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by DeShawn Chase. (mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chase v. Metzger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeShawn Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?