Mellott et al v. St. Jude Medical, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Mellott and Vittoria M. Mellott
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc. and St. Jude Medical, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01779
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Christopher J Burke
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Brian Rostocki, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 12(a), #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 13(a), #18 Exhibit 14)(Rostocki, Brian)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rostocki, Brian)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Jeffrey L. Mellott, Vittoria M. Mellott, St. Jude Medical, LLC. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/14/2019. (nmf)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to respond to the Complaint to November 20, 2019 filed by St. Jude Medical, LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Abbott Laboratories, Inc. answer due 11/20/2019; St. Jude Medical, LLC answer due 11/20/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/14/2019. (fms)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to Judge Connolly and Judge Burke from Brian M. Rostocki regarding related actions. (Rostocki, Brian)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to respond to the Complaint to November 20, 2019 - filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Rostocki, Brian)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 REDACTED VERSION of Sealed Complaint by Jeffrey L. Mellott, Vittoria M. Mellott. (Culley, David)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to respond to the Complaint to November 14, 2019 filed by St. Jude Medical, LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Abbott Laboratories, Inc. answer due 11/14/2019; St. Jude Medical, LLC answer due 11/14/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/7/2019. (fms)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to respond to the Complaint to November 14, 2019 - filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Rostocki, Brian)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Amy McLaren, The Corporation Trust Company, registered agent for Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc. on 9/23/2019, filed by Jeffrey L. Mellott, Vittoria M. Mellott. (Culley, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complant served on Amy McLaren, The Corporation Trust Company on 9/23/2019, filed by Jeffrey L. Mellott, Vittoria M. Mellott. (Culley, David)
September 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 23, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (kmd)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal. It is further ordered that Plaintiffs shall coordinate with Defendants to file a redacted public version of the sealed Complaint within seven days of service of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/23/2019. (kmd)
September 23, 2019 Remark: Exit copies of documents to duty judge (CFC). (kmd)
September 23, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Abbott Laboratories, Inc. on 9/23/2019; St. Jude Medical, LLC on 9/23/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX032414.) - filed by Jeffrey L. Mellott, Vittoria M. Mellott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to file Complaint Under Seal - filed by Jeffrey L. Mellott, Vittoria M. Mellott. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Exhibit - Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order, #3 Exhibit A to Proposed Protective Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mellott et al v. St. Jude Medical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Mellott
Represented By: David G. Culley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vittoria M. Mellott
Represented By: David G. Culley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?