Peek v. BestBuy.com, LLC
Plaintiff: Keith Peek
Defendant: BestBuy.com, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01785
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SO ORDERED re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/29/2019. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 10/29/2019*** (dlw)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Keith Peek (nmg)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Default as to BestBuy.com, LLC - filed by Keith Peek. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(sam)
October 24, 2019 Remark - Copy of updated docket mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 10/24/2019. (dlw)
October 24, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 7 has been deleted from the docket and re-filed in the proper way - motion as one entry and opening brief in support as a separate entry. (dlw)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BestBuy.com, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G)(dlw)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3), and 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim - filed by BestBuy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(dlw)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Helene Elizabeth Episcopo on behalf of BestBuy.com, LLC (Episcopo, Helene)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/8/2019. (kmd)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Keith Peek. (myr)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, Plaintiff shall submit IFP long form application or pay in full the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/17/2019. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/26/2019. (sam)
September 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Court of Common Pleas for New Castle County, Case Number CPU4-19-001816 (No Fee Paid, No IFP) - filed by Keith Peek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peek v. BestBuy.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BestBuy.com, LLC
Represented By: Helene Elizabeth Episcopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?