Humes v. Assanis et al
Plaintiff: Ian Frank Humes
Defendant: Kathy Jennings and Dennis Assanis
Case Number: 1:2019cv01816
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, denying request to proceed informa pauperis. ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/30/2019. (myr)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff shall submit IFP long form application or pay in full the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to submit items within 21 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/23/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/2/2019. (nmg)
October 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT - filed Pro Se against Dennis Assanis, Kathy Jennings - filed by Ian Frank Humes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Ian Frank Humes. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humes v. Assanis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Assanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Frank Humes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?