Worldwide Machinery, LTD. v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Plaintiff: Worldwide Machinery, LTD.
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Debtor: Welded Construction, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01853
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #9 . (fms)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Carickhoff, David)
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/1/2019. (kmd)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Record of case transferred in from District of West Virginia Northern; Case Number in Other District: 5:19-cv-00259. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
October 2, 2019 Case transferred to District of of Delaware. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/2/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The #2 Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC ("Columbia") is GRANTED IN PART. This matter is hereby ORDERED TRANSFERRED to the District of Delaware. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/2/19. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTY COURT DOCKET SHEET. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Transmittal of Record to United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Withdrawing Reference. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/4/2019. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION To Transfer Adversary, by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers, filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worldwide Machinery, LTD. v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Worldwide Machinery, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Welded Construction, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: David W. Carickhoff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?