Karp v. Begley et al
Plaintiff: Howard Karp and Alex DiGaudio
Defendant: Robert A. Hagemann, David C. Dvorak, Paul M. Bisaro, Betsy J. Bernard, Daniel P. Florin, TPG Partners V, L.P., Michael W. Michelson, Christopher B Begley, Tony W. Collins, Jeffrey K. Rhodes, KKR Biomet LLC, Larry Glasscock, Gail K. Boudreaux, TPG FOF V-A, L.P., TPG LVB Co-Invest LLC, TPG FOF V-B, L.P., Arthur J. Higgins, Michael J. Farrell, TPG LVB Co-Invest II LLC, TPG Partners IV, L.P. and Cecil B. Pickett
Nominal Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01855
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jody Barillare on behalf of Christopher B Begley, Betsy J. Bernard, Paul M. Bisaro, Gail K. Boudreaux, Tony W. Collins, David C. Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A. Hagemann, Arthur J. Higgins, Cecil B. Pickett, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. (Barillare, Jody)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (4 in 1:19-cv-01926-LPS, 3 in 1:19-cv-01855-LPS) STIPULATION Regarding Service, Consolidation, Appointment of Plaintiffs' Leadership, and Scheduling. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/29/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01855-LPS, 1:19-cv-01926-LPS (ntl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION Regarding Service, Consolidation, Appointment of Plaintiffs' Leadership, and Scheduling with [Proposed] Order by Christopher B Begley, Betsy J. Bernard, Paul M. Bisaro, Gail K. Boudreaux, Tony W. Collins, David C. Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A. Hagemann, Arthur J. Higgins, Cecil B. Pickett, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Barillare, Jody)
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 4, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Christopher B Begley on 10/4/2019; Betsy J. Bernard on 10/4/2019; Paul M. Bisaro on 10/4/2019; Gail K. Boudreaux on 10/4/2019; Tony W. Collins on 10/4/2019; David C. Dvorak on 10/4/2019; Michael J. Farrell on 10/4/2019; Daniel P. Florin on 10/4/2019; Larry Glasscock on 10/4/2019; Robert A. Hagemann on 10/4/2019; Arthur J. Higgins on 10/4/2019; KKR Biomet LLC on 10/4/2019; Michael W. Michelson on 10/4/2019; Cecil B. Pickett on 10/4/2019; Jeffrey K. Rhodes on 10/4/2019; TPG FOF V-A, L.P. on 10/4/2019; TPG FOF V-B, L.P. on 10/4/2019; TPG LVB Co-Invest II LLC on 10/4/2019; TPG LVB Co-Invest LLC on 10/4/2019; TPG Partners IV, L.P. on 10/4/2019; TPG Partners V, L.P. on 10/4/2019; Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. on 10/4/2019. (myr)
October 2, 2019 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Christopher B Begley, Betsy J. Bernard, Paul M. Bisaro, Gail K. Boudreaux, Tony W. Collins, David C. Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A. Hagemann, Arthur J. Higgins, KKR Biomet LLC, Michael W. Michelson, Cecil B. Pickett, Jeffrey K. Rhodes, TPG FOF V-A, L.P., TPG FOF V-B, L.P., TPG LVB Co-Invest II LLC, TPG LVB Co-Invest LLC, TPG Partners IV, L.P., TPG Partners V, L.P., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2745743.) - filed by Howard Karp. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karp v. Begley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Hagemann
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Dvorak
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Bisaro
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy J. Bernard
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel P. Florin
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Partners V, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Michelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher B Begley
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony W. Collins
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey K. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKR Biomet LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Glasscock
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail K. Boudreaux
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG FOF V-A, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG LVB Co-Invest LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG FOF V-B, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Higgins
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Farrell
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG LVB Co-Invest II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Partners IV, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil B. Pickett
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Karp
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex DiGaudio
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?