In re: Center City Healthcare, LLC d/b/a Hahnemann University Hospital
Appellee: Tenet Business Services Corporation and Conifer Revenue Cycle Solutions, LLC
Appellant: Center City Healthcare, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01858
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORAL ORDER: The briefing schedule for the appeal is VACATED (see D.I. #14 ). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/8/2019. (nms)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Mark Minuti, Counsel for Center City Healthcare regarding settlement. (Minuti, Mark)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 REDACTED VERSION of #7 Statement of the Issues to Be Presented on Appeal and Designation of Record on Appeal, by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (DiSabatino, Monique) Modified on 11/4/2019 (nms).
November 4, 2019 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #7 . (nms)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 REDACTED VERSION of #10 Counter-Designation of Additional Items to Be Included in Record on Appeal, by Conifer Revenue Cycle Solutions, LLC, Tenet Business Services Corporation. (Jones, Laura) Modified on 11/4/2019 (nms).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SO ORDERED Granting #9 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation (*Set Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 11/11/2019, Appellee Brief due by 11/25/2019, Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/3/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/25/2019. (nms)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 [SEALED] Counter-Designation of Additional Items to be Included in Record on Appeal, filed by Conifer Revenue Cycle Solutions, LLC, Tenet Business Services Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O, #2 Exhibit P, #3 Exhibit Q, #4 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Laura) Modified on 10/25/2019 (nms).
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/22/19. (cak)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #5 MOTION to Accept Documents into Appellate Record Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/15/2019. (nms)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 [SEALED] STATEMENT and Designation of Record on Appeal, filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit K, #8 Exhibit L, #9 Exhibit M, #10 Exhibit N, #11 Certificate of Service)(DiSabatino, Monique) Modified on 10/15/2019 (nms).
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #5 MOTION to Accept Documents into Appellate Record Under Seal, by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (DiSabatino, Monique) Modified on 10/15/2019 (nms).
October 11, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Sealed Exhibits E through N filed at D.I. #4 have been removed from that filing. Non-Sealed and sealed filings are not to be coupled together. Counsel will refile the sealed exhibits in a Sealed Volume 2 of the Statement of Issues to be Presented on Appeal. (nms)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Accept Documents into Appellate Record Under Seal - filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DiSabatino, Monique) Modified on 10/11/2019 (nms).
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of Issues to be Presented on Appeal and Designation of Record on Appeal, filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(DiSabatino, Monique) Modified on 10/11/2019 (nms).
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Thursday, October 17, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/3/19. (cak)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (kmd)
October 3, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (kmd)
October 3, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (kmd)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 9/19/2019 by Judge Kevin Gross in Bankruptcy case number 19-11466-KG. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Appeal Transmittal Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Center City Healthcare, LLC d/b/a Hahnemann University Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tenet Business Services Corporation
Represented By: Timothy P. Cairns
Represented By: Laura Davis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Conifer Revenue Cycle Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Timothy P. Cairns
Represented By: Laura Davis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Center City Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Monique Bair DiSabatino
Represented By: Mark Minuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?