Mariner Royal Holdings, LLC et al v. F.N.B. Corporation
Plaintiff: Mariner Finance, LLC and Mariner Royal Holdings, LLC
Defendant: F.N.B. Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01859
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 REDACTED VERSION of #15 Reply Brief Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Their Motion to Remand by Mariner Finance, LLC, Mariner Royal Holdings, LLC. (Donimirski, Melissa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Mariner Finance, LLC, Mariner Royal Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Donimirski, Melissa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Mariner Finance, LLC, Mariner Royal Holdings, LLC re #7 MOTION to Remand . (Donimirski, Melissa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 REDACTED VERSION of #10 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Remand by F.N.B. Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chapple, Benjamin)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Oral Argument by F.N.B. Corporation re #7 MOTION to Remand . (Chapple, Benjamin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT re #10 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Remand by F.N.B. Corporation. (Chapple, Benjamin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by F.N.B. Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Chapple, Benjamin)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (17 in 1:19-cv-01643-LPS, 6 in 1:19-cv-01859-LPS) STIPULATION Governing Briefing on the Mariner Parties' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Remand filed by F.N.B. Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/28/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01643-LPS, 1:19-cv-01859-LPS (ntl)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 REDACTED VERSION of #8 Opening Brief in Support, of Their Motion to Remand by Mariner Finance, LLC, Mariner Royal Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Shall Remain Under Seal In Its Entirety), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Donimirski, Melissa)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Mariner Finance, LLC, Mariner Royal Holdings, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Donimirski, Melissa)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand - filed by Mariner Finance, LLC, Mariner Royal Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Donimirski, Melissa)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Governing Briefing on the Mariner Parties' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Remand by F.N.B. Corporation. (Chapple, Benjamin)
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Melissa Donimirski regarding Related Cases. (Donimirski, Melissa)
October 3, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Notice of Removal and Exhibit 1 thereto. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/3/2019. (mdb)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 [SEALED] NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Chancery Court, Case Number 2019-0781 TMR (Filing fee $400, receipt number DEX032470)- filed by F.N.B. Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal Notice of Removal and Exhibit 1 thereto - filed by F.N.B. Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mariner Royal Holdings, LLC et al v. F.N.B. Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.N.B. Corporation
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Represented By: Justin M. Forcier
Represented By: Benjamin P. Chapple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariner Finance, LLC
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Represented By: Kurt M. Heyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariner Royal Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Represented By: Kurt M. Heyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?