Finney v. Saul
Plaintiff: Twanda Finney
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01867
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/18/2019. (kmd)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/9/2019. (nmg)
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Benderson, Heather)
October 4, 2019 No Summons Issued. (myr)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Twanda Finney (IFP, NO Fee Paid). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Twanda Finney. (myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finney v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twanda Finney
Represented By: Vanessa L. Kassab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?