In re: W.R. Grace & Co., et. al
Appellee: Brenda L. Vinson, Ignacio C. Almeida, Kenneth B. Neubauer, Laurie A. Waller, Shirline E. Almeida, Joyce I. Lundvall, Russell S. Barnes, Melba C. Weston, Ruby R. Hagner, Sandra L. Barnes, Amanda K. Foss, Edward D. Stefanatz, Dennis L. Welch, Phyllis A. Haugen, Tammy Sue Lang, Fred O. Bache, Jeremy B. Carr, Martin H. Krebs, Kerry L. Beasley, Gloria G. Harris, Johnny G. Jellesed, Julie L. Gifford, Thomas F. Erickson, William E. Deshazer, Lorraine B. Sichting, William G. Corbett and Jack L. Jensen
Appellant: Continental Casualty Company and Transportation Insurance Company
Debtor: W.R. Grace & Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01871
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORAL ORDER: Having received a recommendation #8 from Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge that this matter be withdrawn from the mandatory referral for mediation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the recommendation is ACCEPTED and the parties' request for a stay of briefing is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall advise the Court within five (5) days after the Third Circuit renders a decision on the parties' joint request for certification of a direct appeal. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/26/19. (ntl)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/30/19. (cak)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Continental Casualty Company, Transportation Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Evan)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gerard J. Cedrone, Esq. filed by Continental Casualty Company, Transportation Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/17/2019. (etg)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Burgess, Esq. filed by Continental Casualty Company, Transportation Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/17/2019. (etg)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Giannotto, Esq. filed by Continental Casualty Company, Transportation Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/17/2019. (etg)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gerard J. Cedrone, Esq. - filed by Continental Casualty Company, Transportation Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gerard J. Cedrone, Esq.)(Miller, Evan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Burgess, Esq. - filed by Continental Casualty Company, Transportation Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Brian Burgess, Esq.)(Miller, Evan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Giannotto, Esq. - filed by Continental Casualty Company, Transportation Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael S. Giannotto, Esq.)(Miller, Evan)
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Tuesday, October 22, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/8/19. (cak)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (mal)
October 4, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (mal)
October 4, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (mal)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 09/23/2019 by Ashley M. Chan in Bankruptcy case number 15-50766. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Transportation Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Opinion and Order, #2 Appeal Transmittal Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: W.R. Grace & Co., et. al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brenda L. Vinson
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ignacio C. Almeida
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kenneth B. Neubauer
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Laurie A. Waller
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shirline E. Almeida
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joyce I. Lundvall
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Russell S. Barnes
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Melba C. Weston
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ruby R. Hagner
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sandra L. Barnes
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Amanda K. Foss
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Edward D. Stefanatz
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dennis L. Welch
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Phyllis A. Haugen
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tammy Sue Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fred O. Bache
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jeremy B. Carr
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Martin H. Krebs
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kerry L. Beasley
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gloria G. Harris
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Johnny G. Jellesed
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Julie L. Gifford
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas F. Erickson
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William E. Deshazer
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lorraine B. Sichting
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William G. Corbett
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jack L. Jensen
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Evan Thomas Miller
Represented By: Scott D. Cousins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Transportation Insurance Company
Represented By: Evan Thomas Miller
Represented By: Scott D. Cousins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: W.R. Grace & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?