Freeman v. Saul
Plaintiff: Duane Erik Freeman, Sr.
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01872
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal exhibits to #1 Complaint - filed by Duane Erik Freeman, Sr. (lak)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Duane Erik Freeman, Sr., Social Security Administration served on 10/21/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (lak)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Duane Erik Freeman, Sr., U.S. Attorneys Office served on 10/21/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (lak)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Duane Erik Freeman, U.S. Attorney General served on 10/21/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (lak)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Benderson, Heather)
October 11, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, and Andrew Saul on 10/11/2019. (amf)
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 4, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX032476.) - filed by Duane Erik Freeman, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Acknowledgement of Consent Form, #3 Acknowledgement of Rule 4, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Erik Freeman, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?