In re: Zohar III, Corp. et al
Appellant: Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Ark Investment Partners II, LP, Octaluna III, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Zohar Holdings, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC and LD Investments, LLC
Appellee: Zohar CDO 2003-1, Limited, Zohar III, Corp., Zohar II 2005-1, Limited, Zohar III, Limited, Zohar II 2005-1, Corp., Zohar CDO 2003-1, Corp. and MBIA Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01874
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 40 REDACTED VERSION of #39 Appendix,, by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Reilley, Patrick)
November 8, 2019 Filing 39 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #38 Appellant's Brief, by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reilley, Patrick)
November 8, 2019 Filing 38 Appellant's BRIEF by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Reilley, Patrick)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #17 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Intervene // Motion of MBIA Insurance Corporation for Leave to Intervene as Appellee Pursuant to Rule 8013(g) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/8/2019. (dlw)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING #34 RECOMMENDATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Recommendation is ADOPTED and this matter is withdrawn from the mandatory referral for mediation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court ADOPTS and ORDERS the following briefing schedule purposed by the parties: Opening Brief: 11/8/2019; Answering Brief: 12/9/2019; Reply Brief: 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/8/2019. (dlw)
November 7, 2019 Filing 36 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from counsel to Patriarch and the Debtors regarding Joint Statement on Briefing Schedule - re #34 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation, #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,,. (Reilley, Patrick)
November 7, 2019 Filing 35 Local Rule 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #17 MOTION to Intervene // Motion of MBIA Insurance Corporation for Leave to Intervene as Appellee Pursuant to Rule 8013(g) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure by MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Form of Order)(Jones, Laura) Modified on 11/7/2019 (dlw).
November 7, 2019 Filing 34 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/7/19. (cak)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #33 MOTION (Unopposed) to Increase Word Count In Reply In Further Support of Appellants' Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process re #32 Appellant's Reply Brief - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the word count is increased from 2,600 words to 3,900 words. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/6/2019. (dlw)
November 5, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION (Unopposed) to Increase Word Count In Reply In Further Support of Appellants' Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process re #32 Appellant's Reply Brief, - filed by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Reilley, Patrick)
November 5, 2019 Filing 32 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Pernick, Norman)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #30 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/4/2019. (dlw)
November 1, 2019 Filing 30 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Document: #29 Designation of Record on Appeal // Debtors-Appellees' Motion for an Order Accepting Under Seal Certain Documents Designated for Inclusion in Record on Appeal, MOTION to Seal - filed by Zohar III, Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Neiburg, Michael) Modified on 11/4/2019 (dlw).
November 1, 2019 Filing 29 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Zohar III, Corp. // Debtors-Appellees' Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal (Neiburg, Michael) Modified on 11/4/2019 (dlw).
November 1, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of (I) Its Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process and (II) the Appeal) - filed by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Reilley, Patrick) Modified on 11/1/2019 (dlw).
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory M. Petrick, #27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua P. Arnold, #26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michele C. Maman, #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan M. Hoff, #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ingrid Bagby to represent MBIA Insurance Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/31/2019. (dlw)
October 30, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua P. Arnold of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP to represent MBIA Insurance Corporation - filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Cairns, Timothy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michele C. Maman of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP to represent MBIA Insurance Corporation - filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Cairns, Timothy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ingrid Bagby of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP to represent MBIA Insurance Corporation - filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Cairns, Timothy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan M. Hoff of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP to represent MBIA Insurance Corporation - filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Cairns, Timothy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory M. Petrick of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP to represent MBIA Insurance Corporation - filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Cairns, Timothy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 STATEMENT // MBIA Insurance Corporation's Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 8012 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure by MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Jones, Laura) Modified on 10/31/2019 (dlw).
October 30, 2019 Filing 21 STATEMENT - Debtors-Appellees' Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 8012 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure by Zohar III, Corp. (Nestor, Michael) Modified on 10/30/2019 (dlw).
October 30, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 20 and Attachment #1 Exhibit A to D.I. 17 have been replaced on the docket in order to remove a draft header. (dlw)
October 29, 2019 Filing 20 JOINDER by MBIA Insurance Corporation, joining in #19 Answering Brief in Opposition,, // Proposed Intervenor and Appellee MBIA Insurance Corporation's Joinder to Debtors-Appellees' Objection to Appellants' Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Laura) (Main Document 20 replaced on 10/30/2019) (dlw).
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Stay // Appellants' Motion For a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process filed by Zohar III, Corp. Reply Brief due date per Stipulation is 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit A - G)(Nestor, Michael) Modified on 10/30/2019 (dlw).
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Jonathan M. Hoff re #17 MOTION to Intervene by MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Laura) Modified on 10/30/2019 (dlw).
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Intervene // Motion of MBIA Insurance Corporation for Leave to Intervene as Appellee Pursuant to Rule 8013(g) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure - filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Laura) Modified on 10/30/2019 (dlw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/30/2019) (dlw).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #16 Stipulation and Order (Set Briefing Schedule: re #4 MOTION to Stay // Appellants' Motion For a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process - Answering Brief due 10/29/2019. Reply Brief due 11/5/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/21/2019. (dlw)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and Order re #4 MOTION to Stay // Appellants' Motion For a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process by Zohar III, Corp.. (Neiburg, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SO ORDERED re #14 Appellants' UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Under Seal Documents Designated for Inclusion in Record on Appeal. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/21/2019. (dlw)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Appellants' UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Under Seal Documents Designated for Inclusion in Record on Appeal - filed by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reilley, Patrick) Modified on 10/21/2019 (dlw).
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC and Statement of Issues on Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a). (Reilley, Patrick)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mary Beth Maloney, Esquire, #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Monica K. Loseman, Esquire, #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Akiva Shapiro, Esquire, #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Randy M. Mastro, Esquire, and #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert Klyman, Esquire filed by Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Zohar Holdings, LLC, LD Investments, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Ark Investment Partners II, LP, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Octaluna LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/16/2019. (dlw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Akiva Shapiro, Esquire - filed by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Pernick, Norman)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Monica K. Loseman, Esquire - filed by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Pernick, Norman)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mary Beth Maloney, Esquire - filed by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Pernick, Norman)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Randy M. Mastro, Esquire - filed by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Pernick, Norman)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert Klyman, Esquire - filed by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Pernick, Norman)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT // Patriarch's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 8012 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Pernick, Norman) Modified on 10/15/2019 (dlw).
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #4 MOTION to Stay // Appellants' Motion For a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Pernick, Norman) Modified on 10/15/2019 (dlw).
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Lynn Tilton re #4 MOTION to Stay // Appellants' Motion For a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process by Lynn Tilton. (Pernick, Norman) Modified on 10/15/2019 (dlw).
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay // Appellants' Motion For a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process - filed by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #3 Exhibit B (Bankruptcy Court Order, D.I. 974), #4 Exhibit C (Order Approving Settlement Agreement, D.I. 266), #5 Exhibit D (Tr. 2019.09.05, D.I. 908), #6 Exhibit E (Tr. 2019.09.24), #7 Exhibit F (Order Decision Tr. 2019.09.27), #8 Certificate of Service)(Pernick, Norman) Modified on 10/15/2019 (dlw).
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Tuesday, October 22, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/8/19. (cak)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (mal)
October 4, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (mal)
October 4, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (mal)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 09/27/2019 by Honorable Judge Karen B. Owen in Bankruptcy case number 18-10512 (KBO). Fee Status Paid.- filed by Zohar Holdings, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Lynn Tilton, Octaluna III, LLC, Ark Investment Partners II, LP, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, LD Investments, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Ark Angels II, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal, #2 Order on Appeal)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Zohar III, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ark Investment Partners II, LP
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Octaluna III, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ark Angels III, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Octaluna LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Zohar Holdings, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Octaluna II, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd.
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ark Angels II, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ark Angels VIII, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patriarch Partners XV, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ark Angels, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lynn Tilton
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patriarch Partners, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LD Investments, LLC
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Represented By: Norman L. Pernick
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Zohar CDO 2003-1, Limited
Represented By: Ryan M. Bartley
Represented By: Michael R. Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Zohar III, Corp.
Represented By: Ryan M. Bartley
Represented By: Michael R. Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Zohar II 2005-1, Limited
Represented By: Ryan M. Bartley
Represented By: Michael R. Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Zohar III, Limited
Represented By: Ryan M. Bartley
Represented By: Michael R. Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Zohar II 2005-1, Corp.
Represented By: Ryan M. Bartley
Represented By: Michael R. Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Zohar CDO 2003-1, Corp.
Represented By: Ryan M. Bartley
Represented By: Michael R. Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MBIA Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Timothy P. Cairns
Represented By: Laura Davis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?