AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al. v. Bell et al
Plaintiff: AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al.
Defendant: Roam-Tel Partners, Ellen M. Martin, Ronald J. Gotchall and Rosa Lee Gotchall
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Alan R. Bell, Michael T. Bowers and Om Parkash Kalra
Counter Defendant: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC and AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Intervenor: United States
Case Number: 1:2019cv01890
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 26 REQUEST for Oral Argument by United States. (Scott, Olivia) Modified on 12/5/2019 (nms).
December 2, 2019 Filing 25 REQUEST for Oral Argument, by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC, New Cingular Wireless, PCS, LLC. (Schiltz, Todd) Modified on 12/3/2019 (nms).
November 27, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST for Oral Argument by APR Plaintiffs. (Keener, Carmella) Modified on 12/2/2019 (nms).
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Remand, filed by APR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2)(Keener, Carmella) Modified on 12/2/2019 (nms).
November 20, 2019 Filing 22 STATEMENT of Interest in Opposition to Motions to Remand, by United States. (Scott, Olivia) Modified on 11/21/2019 (nms).
November 20, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al., New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Schiltz, Todd)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to #9 Amended Motion to Coordinate Related Actions, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al., New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Schiltz, Todd) Modified on 11/19/2019 (nms).
November 13, 2019 Filing 19 REDACTED VERSION of #16 Sealed Exhibits, by APR Plaintiffs, APR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 8, 10-11, 13, 16-17, 19, 26-27)(Keener, Carmella) Modified on 11/14/2019 (nms).
November 13, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 19 has been removed from the docket. This filing appeared to be a redacted version of an earlier sealed filing. Counsel shall refile the redacted document using the Redacted Document filing code. (nms)
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 Amended Certificate of Service of Confidential Exhibits, filed by APR Plaintiffs. (Keener, Carmella) Modified on 11/8/2019 (nms).
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service for Sealed Exhibits (D.I. #16 ) by APR Plaintiffs. (Keener, Carmella) Modified on 11/7/2019 (nms).
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re #14 Opening Brief in Support, by APR Plaintiffs, APR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Keener, Carmella) Modified on 11/6/2019 (nms).
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBITS re #14 Opening Brief in Support, by APR Plaintiffs, APR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Keener, Carmella) Modified on 11/6/2019 (nms).
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by APR Plaintiffs.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/20/2019. (Keener, Carmella)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand - filed by APR Plaintiffs, APR Plaintiffs. (Keener, Carmella) Modified on 11/6/2019 (nms).
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Oral Argument, by United States. (Scott, Olivia) Modified on 11/6/2019 (nms).
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to #4 MOTION to Intervene and for a Stay of Proceedings, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Scott, Olivia) Modified on 10/31/2019 (nms).
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 Identifying all Pending Matters Which Require Judicial Action by AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al.. (Schiltz, Todd) Modified on 10/29/2019 (nms).
October 29, 2019 Remark: The Motion to Coordinate Related Cases filed on 10/25/2019, has been deactivated as AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, and New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC has filed an Amended Motion to Coordinate Related Cases on 10/28/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01886-RGA et al.(nms)
October 28, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline: Amended Motion to Coordinate Related. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/12/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01886-RGA et al.(nms)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Amended Motion to Coordinate Related Actions - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al., New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schiltz, Todd) Modified on 10/28/2019 (nms).
October 25, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #8 MOTION to Coordinate Related Cases. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/8/2019. (nms)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Coordinate Related Cases - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al., New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Schiltz, Todd) Modified on 10/28/2019 (nms).
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to #4 Motion To Intervene and for Stay of Proceedings, by APR Plaintiffs. (Keener, Carmella) Modified on 10/24/2019 (nms).
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Intervene and for a Stay of Proceedings, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al., New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-J)(Schiltz, Todd) Modified on 10/24/2019 (nms).
October 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura P. Warrick for AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
October 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura P. Warrick for AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marty L. Brimmage, Jr., Laura P. Warrick, William M. Connolly and Zoe K. Wilhem filed by AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al., AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/16/2019. (nms)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marty L. Brimmage, Jr., Laura P. Warrick, William M. Connolly and Zoe K. Wilhem - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al., New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Marty L. Brimmage, Jr., #3 Certification of Laura P. Warrick, #4 Certification of William M. Connolly, #5 Certification of Zoe K. Wilhelm)(Schiltz, Todd)
October 9, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re MOTION to Intervene and for a Stay of Proceedings. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/23/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01886-RGA et al.(nms)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Intervene and for a Stay of Proceedings - filed by United States. (Scott, Olivia) Modified on 10/10/2019 (nms).
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01886-RGA through 1:19-cv-01897-RGA and 1:19-cv-01899-RGA through 1:19-cv-01901-RGA (rjb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al. (myr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Ct of Chancery, Case Number 6886-VCL (Filing fee $400, receipt number 311-2749416)- filed by AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Index to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A-L to Index, #3 Exhibit M 1-43, #4 Civil Cover Sheet with Exhibit A)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al. v. Bell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Alan R. Bell
Represented By: Marcus Montejo
Represented By: Eric Joseph Juray
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Ronald Alva Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Gregory Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Michael T. Bowers
Represented By: Marcus Montejo
Represented By: Eric Joseph Juray
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Ronald Alva Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Gregory Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Om Parkash Kalra
Represented By: Marcus Montejo
Represented By: Eric Joseph Juray
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Ronald Alva Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Gregory Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roam-Tel Partners
Represented By: Marcus Montejo
Represented By: Eric Joseph Juray
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Ronald Alva Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Gregory Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen M. Martin
Represented By: Marcus Montejo
Represented By: Eric Joseph Juray
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Ronald Alva Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Gregory Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald J. Gotchall
Represented By: Marcus Montejo
Represented By: Eric Joseph Juray
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Ronald Alva Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Gregory Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Lee Gotchall
Represented By: Marcus Montejo
Represented By: Eric Joseph Juray
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Ronald Alva Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Gregory Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC
Represented By: Laura P. Warrick
Represented By: Marcus Montejo
Represented By: Eric Joseph Juray
Represented By: Todd C. Schiltz
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Ronald Alva Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Gregory Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC
Represented By: Todd C. Schiltz
Represented By: Laura P. Warrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Todd C. Schiltz
Represented By: Laura P. Warrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Mobility Wireless Operations Holdings LLC, et al.
Represented By: Todd C. Schiltz
Represented By: Laura P. Warrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States
Represented By: Olivia H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?