Consolidated Transaction Processing LLC v. The Home Depot, Inc.
Plaintiff: Consolidated Transaction Processing LLC
Defendant: The Home Depot, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01917
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to January 21, 2020 - filed by Consolidated Transaction Processing LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Seastone Kraft on behalf of The Home Depot, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Larson on behalf of The Home Depot, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Larson, Erin)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: The Home Depot, Inc. answer due 12/19/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/4/2019. (nms)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time, by The Home Depot, Inc.. (Biggs, Brian) Modified on 11/4/2019 (nms).
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Consolidated Transaction Processing LLC. The Home Depot, Inc. served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01915-RGA, 1:19-cv-01916-RGA, 1:19-cv-01917-RGA, 1:19-cv-01918-RGA, 1:19-cv-01919-RGA (rjb)
October 9, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to The Home Depot, Inc. on 10/9/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,712,846 B2 ;US 8,396,743 B2. (lak)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against The Home Depot, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2751347.) - filed by Consolidated Transaction Processing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consolidated Transaction Processing LLC v. The Home Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Transaction Processing LLC
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Denise Seastone Kraft
Represented By: Erin E. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?