DiGaudio v. Begley et al
Plaintiff: Alex DiGaudio
Defendant: Robert A. Hagemann, David C. Dvorak, Paul M. Bisaro, Betsy J. Bernard, Daniel P. Florin, TPG Partners V, L.P., Michael W. Michelson, Christopher B Begley, Tony W. Collins, Jeffrey K. Rhodes, KKR Biomet LLC, Larry Glasscock, Gail K. Boudreaux, TPG FOF V-A, L.P., TPG LVB Co-Invest LLC, TPG FOF V-B, L.P., Arthur J. Higgins, Michael J. Farrell, TPG LVB Co-Invest II LLC, TPG Partners IV, L.P. and Cecil B. Pickett
Nominal Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01926
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jody Barillare on behalf of Christopher B Begley, Betsy J. Bernard, Paul M. Bisaro, Gail K. Boudreaux, Tony W. Collins, David C. Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A. Hagemann, Arthur J. Higgins, Cecil B. Pickett, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. (Barillare, Jody)
October 29, 2019 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:19-cv-01855-LPS. ALL PAPERS SHALL BE FILED IN LEAD CASE NO. 19-1855-LPS ONLY. (ntl)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (4 in 1:19-cv-01926-LPS, 3 in 1:19-cv-01855-LPS) STIPULATION Regarding Service, Consolidation, Appointment of Plaintiffs' Leadership, and Scheduling. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/29/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01855-LPS, 1:19-cv-01926-LPS (ntl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Regarding Service, Consolidation, Appointment of Plaintiffs' Leadership, and Scheduling with [Proposed] Order by Christopher B Begley, Betsy J. Bernard, Paul M. Bisaro, Gail K. Boudreaux, Tony W. Collins, David C. Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A. Hagemann, Arthur J. Higgins, Cecil B. Pickett, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Barillare, Jody)
October 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lee Squitieri for Alex DiGaudio added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lee Squitieri filed by Alex DiGaudio. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/21/19. (ntl)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lee Squitieri - filed by Alex DiGaudio. (Bennett, Blake)
October 11, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Stockholder Derivative COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Christopher B Begley, Betsy J. Bernard, Paul M. Bisaro, Gail K. Boudreaux, Tony W. Collins, David C. Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A. Hagemann, Arthur J. Higgins, KKR Biomet LLC, Michael W. Michelson, Cecil B. Pickett, Jeffrey K. Rhodes, TPG FOF V-A, L.P., TPG FOF V-B, L.P., TPG LVB Co-Invest II LLC, TPG LVB Co-Invest LLC, TPG Partners IV, L.P., TPG Partners V, L.P., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2752766.) - filed by Alex DiGaudio. (Attachments: #1 Verification to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiGaudio v. Begley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Hagemann
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Dvorak
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Bisaro
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy J. Bernard
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel P. Florin
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Partners V, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Michelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher B Begley
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony W. Collins
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey K. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKR Biomet LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Glasscock
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail K. Boudreaux
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG FOF V-A, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG LVB Co-Invest LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG FOF V-B, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Higgins
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Farrell
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG LVB Co-Invest II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Partners IV, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil B. Pickett
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex DiGaudio
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?