Express Mobile, Inc. v. Web.com Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Defendant: Web.com Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01936
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to January 13, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Web.com Group, Inc. answer due 1/13/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/5/2019. (nms)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to January 13, 2020 - filed by Web.com Group, Inc.. (Day, John)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Timothy Devlin, regarding status report. (Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 11/26/2019 (nms).
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Web.com Group, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
November 22, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Web.com Group, Inc.. (lak)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORAL ORDER: Defendant's answer was due to be filed on 11/12/2019 (see D.I. #4 ), and to date none has been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/20/2019. (nms)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Web.com Group, Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01936-RGA, 1:19-cv-01937-RGA (rjb)
October 15, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Web.com Group, Inc. on 10/15/2019. (nmg)
October 15, 2019 No Summons Issued. (lak)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 6,546,397 ;U.S. 7,594,168 ;U.S. 9,063,755 ;U.S. 9,471,287 ;U.S. 9,928,044. (lak)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Web.com Group, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2753633.) - filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Express Mobile, Inc. v. Web.com Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Web.com Group, Inc.
Represented By: John G. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?