Broughton v. Hawkins et al
Plaintiff: Theresa Broughton
Defendant: James L. Welch, James E. Hoffman, Robert L. Friedman, Matthew A. Doheny, William R. Davidson, James F. Winestock, Douglas A. Carty, Michael J. Kneeland, Raymond J. Bromark, Stephanie D. Fisher, Darren D. Hawkins, Patricia M. Nazemetz and Jamie G. Pierson
Nominal Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01958
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Page Limitation for Motion to Dismiss or Stay Briefing re #1 Complaint,, by Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, Darren D. Hawkins, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide, Inc.. (Kaprow, Daniel)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ralph C. Ferrara, Ann M. Ashton, Jonathan E. Richman and Julia D. Alonzo filed by YRC Worldwide, Inc., James L. Welch, Robert L. Friedman, Jamie G. Pierson, Patricia M. Nazemetz, William R. Davidson, James E. Hoffman, Douglas A. Carty, Matthew A. Doheny, Michael J. Kneeland, Raymond J. Bromark, James F. Winestock, Darren D. Hawkins, Stephanie D. Fisher. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/15/19. (ntl)
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ralph C. Ferrara, Ann M. Ashton, Jonathan E. Richman and Julia D. Alonzo - filed by Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, Darren D. Hawkins, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide, Inc.. (Dearlove, Cathrine)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 20, 2019 filed by YRC Worldwide, Inc., James L. Welch, Robert L. Friedman, Jamie G. Pierson, Patricia M. Nazemetz, William R. Davidson, James E. Hoffman, Douglas A. Carty, Matthew A. Doheny, Michael J. Kneeland, Raymond J. Bromark, James F. Winestock, Darren D. Hawkins, Stephanie D. Fisher. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/4/19. (ntl)
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 20, 2019 - filed by Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, Darren D. Hawkins, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide, Inc.. (Dearlove, Cathrine)
October 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. James F. Winestock served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. Patricia M. Nazemetz served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. Michael J. Kneeland served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. James E. Hoffman served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. Robert L. Friedman served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. Matthew A. Doheny served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. William R. Davidson served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. Douglas A. Carty served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. Raymond J. Bromark served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. Stephanie D. Fisher served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. Jamie G. Pierson served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. James L. Welch served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. Darren D. Hawkins served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Broughton. YRC Worldwide, Inc. served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 16, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Raymond J. Bromark on 10/16/2019; Douglas A. Carty on 10/16/2019; William R. Davidson on 10/16/2019; Matthew A. Doheny on 10/16/2019; Stephanie D. Fisher on 10/16/2019; Robert L. Friedman on 10/16/2019; Darren D. Hawkins on 10/16/2019; James E. Hoffman on 10/16/2019; Michael J. Kneeland on 10/16/2019; Patricia M. Nazemetz on 10/16/2019; Jamie G. Pierson on 10/16/2019; James L. Welch on 10/16/2019; James F. Winestock on 10/16/2019; YRC Worldwide, Inc. on 10/16/2019. (nmg)
October 15, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) Modified on 10/16/2019 (kmd).
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Stockholder Derivative COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, Darren D. Hawkins, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2755392.) - filed by Theresa Broughton. (Attachments: #1 Verification to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broughton v. Hawkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Welch
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Hoffman
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Friedman
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew A. Doheny
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Davidson
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Winestock
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas A. Carty
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Kneeland
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond J. Bromark
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie D. Fisher
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren D. Hawkins
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia M. Nazemetz
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie G. Pierson
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Broughton
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?