Broome et al v. American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Broome and Chris Salsman
Defendant: American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus and Continental American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01967
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, Continental American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mickler, Frederick)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #12 Stipulation (Set Briefing Schedule: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process - Reply Brief due 12/13/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/6/2019. (dlw)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 Third STIPULATION regarding briefing schedule on motion to dismiss by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, Continental American Insurance Company. (Mickler, Frederick)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to The Honorable Mayellen Noreika from Gary W. Aber regarding courtesy copies of Plaintiffs Answering Brief in Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss.. (Aber, Gary)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Reginald Broome. Reply Brief due date per Stipulation and Order is 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Aber, Gary) Modified on 11/22/2019 (dlw).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #9 Stipulation (Set Briefing Schedule: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process - Answering Brief due 11/22/2019. Reply Brief due 12/6/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/18/2019. (dlw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION regarding briefing schedule on motion to dismiss by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, Continental American Insurance Company. (Mickler, Frederick)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 Stipulation (Set Briefing Schedule: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process - Answering Brief due 11/19/2019. Reply Brief due 11/27/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/7/2019. (dlw)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, Continental American Insurance Company. (Mickler, Frederick) Modified on 11/7/2019 (dlw).
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION regarding briefing scheduling on motion to dismiss by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, Continental American Insurance Company. (Mickler, Frederick)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, Continental American Insurance Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mickler, Frederick)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process - filed by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, Continental American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mickler, Frederick)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Steven Ensor and Brooks A. Suttle filed by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, Continental American Insurance Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/23/2019. (dlw)
October 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Steven Ensor and Brooks A. Suttle - filed by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, Continental American Insurance Company. (Mickler, Frederick)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aflac Incorporated for American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, Continental American Insurance Company filed by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, Continental American Insurance Company. (Mickler, Frederick)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware, Case Number 2019-0734-MTZ (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2756592)- filed by Continental American Insurance Company and American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G - Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broome et al v. American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Broome
Represented By: Gary W. Aber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Salsman
Represented By: Gary W. Aber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus
Represented By: Frederick Troupe Mickler, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental American Insurance Company
Represented By: Frederick Troupe Mickler, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?