Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc. v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Welded Construction, LP and Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Debtor: Welded Construction, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01996
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 CASE CLOSED and 12/2/2019 Telephone Conference cancelled per D.I. #36 Order transferring case to the District of Delaware Bankruptcy Court. (nmf)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Transferring Case to the District of Delaware Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/20/2019. (nmf)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for plaintiff to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/2/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/20/2019. (nmf)
November 18, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #30 MOTION for Reconsideration re #23 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,,,, : Answering Brief of Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC's Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David W. Carickhoff, #2 Certificate of Service)(Carickhoff, David)
November 11, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Plaintiff, Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc. filed by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc. by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc. (Crawford, Katelyn)
November 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph G. Talbot for Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph G. Talbot filed by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/4/2019. (fms)
November 4, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc. re #29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph G. Talbot, #30 MOTION for Reconsideration re #23 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,,,, , #31 Opening Brief in Support, (Horan, Thomas)
November 4, 2019 Filing 31 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #30 MOTION for Reconsideration re #23 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,,,, filed by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/18/2019. (Horan, Thomas)
November 4, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Reconsideration re #23 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,,,, - filed by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Horan, Thomas)
November 4, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph G. Talbot - filed by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Horan, Thomas)
October 25, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.. Welded Construction, LP served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Crawford, Katelyn)
October 25, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Crawford, Katelyn)
October 24, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Welded Construction, LP on 10/24/2019. (kmd)
October 24, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC on 10/24/2019 (2 copies issued). (myr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Crawford, Katelyn)
October 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 25 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/21/2019. (nmg)
October 22, 2019 Filing 24 Record of case transferred in from District of West Virginia Northern; Case Number in Other District: 5:19-cv-00257. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
October 21, 2019 Case transferred to District of Delaware. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING #10 SCHMID PIPELINE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S MOTION TO REMAND AND ABSTAIN, AND GRANTING #17 COLUMBIA GAS TRANSMISSION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL, AND #20 COLUMBIA GAS TRANSMISSION'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE: this matter is hereby ORDERED TRANSFERRED to the District of Delaware. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/21/2019. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 22 OBJECTIONS to #20 MOTION to Transfer Case by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.. (Byrum, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 21 OBJECTIONS to #17 MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.. (Byrum, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Case by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC.(Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM of Law In Support of by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC re #17 MOTION for Partial Dismissal . (Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.s Motion to Remand and Abstain filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order from cited case)(Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING #5 MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/18/2019. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTIONS to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.. (Byrum, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.. (Byrum, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Welded Construction, LP, filed by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Byrum, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/9/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/23/2019; Initial Disclosures due by 11/11/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/9/2019. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.s Motion to Remand and Abstain by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Byrum, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT DOCKET SHEET. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Transmittal of Record to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/4/2019. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Brief/MEMORANDUM by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE upon Herc Services, LLC of Schmid Pipeline Construction Inc.'s Statement Under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9027(e)(3), by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in the Circuit Court of Wetzel County, Case # 19-C-39, filed by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 SCHMID PIPELINE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S STATEMENT UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 9027(e)(3) filed by Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers, filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 10/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc. v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welded Construction, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: David W. Carickhoff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schmid Pipeline Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Michael Horan
Represented By: Joseph G. Talbot
Represented By: Katelyn M. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Welded Construction, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?