Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited et al
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Defendant: Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Alembic Global Holding SA, Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Natco Pharma, Inc. and Natco Pharma Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv02021
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Natco Pharma Limited waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Natco Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Macleods Pharma USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 24, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (kmd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,101,659; 8,796,331; 8,877,938; 9,388,134. (kmd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 9/11/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: see attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 7/7/2023. (kmd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Alembic Global Holding SA, Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Natco Pharma Limited, Natco Pharma, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2763203.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macleods Pharma USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alembic Global Holding SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natco Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natco Pharma Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?