Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Leica Geosystems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Defendant: Leica Geosystems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02039
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 22, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Leica Geosystems, Inc. answer due 1/22/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/11/2019. (dlw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 22, 2020 - filed by Leica Geosystems, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
November 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard L. Wernow for Stormborn Technologies LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02037-MN, 1:19-cv-02038-MN, 1:19-cv-02039-MN, 1:19-cv-02040-MN, 1:19-cv-02041-MN(kmd)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Ewing on behalf of Leica Geosystems, Inc. (Ewing, Alexandra)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 23, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Leica Geosystems, Inc. answer due 12/23/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/15/2019. (dlw)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 23, 2019 - filed by Leica Geosystems, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. Leica Geosystems, Inc. served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Chong, Jimmy)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re (6 in 1:19-cv-02037-MN) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow, (6 in 1:19-cv-02040-MN) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow, (6 in 1:19-cv-02038-MN) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow, (6 in 1:19-cv-02041-MN) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow, (5 in 1:19-cv-02039-MN) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/31/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02037-MN, 1:19-cv-02038-MN, 1:19-cv-02039-MN, 1:19-cv-02040-MN, 1:19-cv-02041-MN(dlw)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
October 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02037-MN, 1:19-cv-02038-MN, 1:19-cv-02039-MN, 1:19-cv-02040-MN, 1:19-cv-02041-MN (rjb)
October 29, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Leica Geosystems, Inc. on 10/29/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (myr)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. RE44,199 E. (myr)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT filed with Jury Demand against Leica Geosystems, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2765334.) - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Leica Geosystems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Represented By: Jimmy C. Chong
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leica Geosystems, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?