Wilson et al v. Dearie et al
Plaintiff: Bradford M. Wilson and Bradford E. Wilson
Defendant: Family Court of the State of Delaware and Kathy Dearie
Case Number: 1:2019cv02064
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Bradford E. Wilson from Clerk's Office regarding status of case. (One free docket copy enclosed)(sam)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to Judge Noreika from Brad E. Wilson regarding his son's filing fee. (sam)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Bradford M. Wilson. (myr)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Bradford M. Wilson. (lak)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Bradford M. Wilson shall file a request to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The failure of Bradford M. Wilson to return the requested application within the thirty days from the date of this Order shall result in his dismissal from the action without prejudice. In addition, Pleadings filed on behalf of both pro se Plaintiffs must be signed by each of them. Accordingly, the Complaint is STRICKEN as it is not signed by both Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs shall file a Complaint signed by each of them within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Failure to file the Complaint signed by both Plaintiffs, within thirty days, shall result in dismissal of the Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/13/2019. (mal)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/6/2019. (amf)
November 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 30, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed against Kathy Dearie, Family Court of the State of Delaware - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Bradford E. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Bradford E. Wilson. (kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Dearie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Court of the State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford E. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?