The Bancorp Bank v. Advanced Payroll Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Bancorp Bank
Defendant: Zuma Payroll Solutions, LLC, Payroll Logix, Inc., Wiggins Payroll, Inc., Focuspay Solutions LLC, Payroll Solutions, Inc., Charleston Payroll Plus, LLC, Valiant Payroll Services, Inc., Advanced Payroll Solutions, Inc., Alliance Benefit Group, Inc., Moneywise Payroll Solutions, Inc., Solex Payroll Systems, Inc., MM-KMA Investments LLC, Choicepay Payroll & HR Services, Inc., Sammons & Head LLC, Midsouth Consulting Group, Assethr, Inc., Timepay$ Corporation, Paydata Payroll Services, Inc., Advanced Payroll Services, Inc., Profit Builders Inc., Human Resources, Inc., PSPay, Inc., Integrity Outsource, LLC, Mint Payroll LLC, Webb Payroll Service Inc., Paysource, Inc., Bene-Care Payroll, LLC, Marathon HR Services, LLC, BBCS Payroll, Inc., Triangle Payroll Services, Inc., Shift Human Capital Management, Inc., Alpha Payroll Services, LLC, Masspay, Inc., Eazepay, LLC, Segue HR, LLC, Computersearch Payroll Services, Simplified Employer Solutions, LLC, Solid Business Solutions, LLC, Integrated Payroll Services, Inc., Igreen Payroll Inc., Payday Payroll Resources, Inc., Paylogic, IEM of Florida LLC, Management Solutions, Inc., Cachet Financial Services, Axiom Human Resources Solutions, Inc., Alliance Business Solutions, LLC, Payroll Plus, Inc., Yarmouth Payroll Plus Inc., Epay Systems, Inc., Clifton Larson Allen LLP, Paymedia, LLC, PR Financial Services, LLC, The Ahola Corporation, Southeastern Employee Benefits Group, Inc., Infocus Payroll, LLC, Shepherd Business Solutions, Inc., Tripco, Inc., Sourceone Payroll Services, Payroll Control Systems, Inc., Custom Payroll Services, RJDB Enterprises, Inc., Employer Tools and Solutions Inc., Infinity HR LLC, Payroll Ease LLC, Coastal Payroll Services, Inc., Hard 8 Acquisitions, LLC, Syndeo Outsourcing, LLC, Payroll Link, Inc., Plaza Park Family Practice, LLC, Steamline Payroll, LLC, G.S. Wilcox & Co., Check Mate Payroll LLC, Payroll Experts LLC, Automatic Business Computing, LLC, Ignite PEO Services, LLC, Unify Employee Integrated Employee Management, Kalter Company Accounting & Consulting Corp., Pay-Tech, Inc., CEOS Corporation, Unify Payroll, LLC, Tri-State Co-Op, PayRollNW, Delaware Valley Plumbing Supply Inc., 1 Source Business Solutions, LLC, Dun-Rite Sand and Gravel Company, Corporate Business Solutions, OTP Payroll LLC, Vertisource, Inc., Workforce Benefit Solutions, LLC, Clockwork Systems, Inc., Shoto D.C., LLC, Apache Homelands, LLC, Green Payroll Services, Inc., Morton Solar & Wind, LLC, Village Bank, H.R. Management Consultants, Inc., Logical Innovations, Inc., AdvanStaff, Inc., The People Group, Asset HR, Inc., Ft. Still Apache Industries, LLC, ShiftPixy, Inc., Focusit, Inc., Vertex Payroll Corp., Admin HR, Inc., Bell Ohio, Inc., HR Ledger, Inc., E-Z Payroll Services Inc., PayPros, Inc., KAL Enterprise LLC, National CPA Payroll LLC, Payroll Services, Inc., Bent on Better, Laise Packaging LLC, Hospitality Resource Center, Business Cents, Inc., HR Solutions, LLC, Hafer PSC, My Strategic Payroll, Intergrity Bookkeeping, LLC, Deterdings Markets, Inc., The Reisen Agency, Inc., Windsorkent, Inc., Nealis Engineering, Inc., Franklin Gringer & Cohen, P.C., Innovative Payroll Processing, Inc., Promerio, Inc., Reisen Agency, Inc., Employer Services Online, LLC, Tanglewood Golf Course, LLC, BEC Enterprises, LLC, The Spinnaker Condominium Corporation, Accu-Rite Business Services, Inc., Pier Group LLC, Pay USA Inc., Dragon Projects, LLC, Total HCM, Inc., Pizza Ranch Inc., Des Dawn Corp/Taxco Payroll Service, Commonwealth Payroll & HR, Mass Pay, Inc., Quanta LLC, Ken Morton & Sons LLC, Niagara Living LLC, HR 365, LLC, Employer's Guardian, LLC, Dynamic Human Resources, Inc., Parkshore Resort, Two Schus Inc., CheckRight, Inc., Polaris Payroll, Ziemer, Stayman, Weitzel & Shoulders, LLP, Verde Human Capital LLC, Civil Search International, LLC, SHS Payroll, LLC, TBS Holdings LLC, Payroll Plus Inc., PRDisburse-Managepoint, LLC, Welch Printing Company, Inc., Fairfield National Bank, TAG Employer Serviices, LLC, Exponent Technologies, Inc., Accent Employer Solutions IV, Inc., The UPS Store Central Square Shopping Center, Certified Payroll Associates, Inc., CPAccounting Solutions Inc., Managepoint, LLC, Office of America, Accent Employer Solutions, Inc., Dekay Fabricators Inc., Advanced Payroll Solutions, LLC, Lee Dental Associates, Ltd., Spectrum Employee Services, Inc., Traverse City Products, Inc., Rolling Hills Country Club, Inc., OnePayHR, LLC, Pay Day Payroll, Inc., Payroll Perfect, Inc., PBI Payroll, FocusPay Solutions, Boys & Girls Club of Evansville, Inc.,, PayDayMasters, All Quality Aluminum Foundry, LLC, Rausch Physical Therapy, Inc., Clear Sky Capital Inc., Little Scotty Inc., JustWorks, Inc., Dominion Payroll Services, LLC, Quintana, Lopez, Donoghue & Gonzalez, LLP, Approved Staffing, Inc., Temptrol Corporation, Payright Payroll Services, Inc., Villiams Inc., Poseidon Consultants Inc., NCD Corsillo Plumbing, LLC, Approved Payroll, Inc., E & B Real Estate Services, Inc., Restaurant Solutions Inc., Harding, Shymanski & Company, PSC, Atlantic City Convention Center, Pacific Premier Bank, Thyme in the Kitchen LLC, Kathi's Check Mate, Eyecare Consultants, LLP, Great Neck Saw Manufacturers, Inc., Property Damage Restoration Inc., PayNorthWest, Inflection HR LLC, JAG Insurance Group, LLC, Better Business Bureau Inc., Ameripay, Inc., ASAP Payroll Service, Inc., Wise Choice, Inc., Stone Industries, Inc., American Payroll Corporation, Employee Benefits Services, Inc., Logical R-Joint Venture, LLC, David R. Miller, DDS, PC, Naltrexzone LLC, Astra Payroll Co., P-Five Solutions, LLC, JFPets LLC, Comp U.S. Payroll Inc., Mitigation Services, Inc., 4Free.com, Inc., Accept Solar LLC, Human Resources Inc., Green Leaf Business Solutions LLC, The Human Resources Consulting Group, LLC, Stirling Services LLC, Concept HR, PayNorthEast LLC, Associated Human Capital Management, LLC, All Quality Machining and Finishing LLC, Time & Pay Inc., William E. Schmidt Foundation Inc., The Troxel Company, Retirement Law Group, Inc., Polyram Compounds LLC, American Time and Labor Company, PayMasters Inc., Union Payroll Solutions Inc., Regional Title Services, LLC, W.A. Bragg & Co., Levin Corporate Law Group, Barking Mad Grooming, LLC, Nimbus Inc., Advanced Compressor Technologies LLC, The UPS Store, Philadephia Pipe Bending Co., Partners in Payroll, LLC, Balance Point Payroll, Atlantic Utility Trailer Sales, Inc., AccuPay, Inc., BeyondPay Inc., National Payroll Systems Inc., Deaf Bible Society, Inc., Access1Source-NC, LLC, One Point Human Capital Management LLC, Quanta HCM, PrimePay, LLC, Davis Jewelers Inc., The UPS Store Atlantic City Convention Center, Payroll Office of America, Verde Human Capital LLC d/b/a OneMint, JFPets LLC d/b/a Pet Supplies Plus, Hard 8 Acquisitions, LLC d/b/a Launch Payroll, Tripco, Inc. d/b/aPayRite, Clockwork Systems, Inc. d/b/a APS, Vertisource, Inc. d/b/a Vertisource HR, Promerio, Inc. d/b/a California Payroll, CEOS Corporation d/b/a TimePays Corporation, Computersearch Corporation, Payroll Success Inc. and Accu-Rite Business Services, Inc. d/b/a Accu-Rite Payroll Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv02088
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #84 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to move, answer or otherwise respond to The Ahola Corporations counterclaim to February 10, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: The Bancorp Bank answer due 2/10/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/3/2020. (dlw)
January 3, 2020 Filing 84 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to move, answer or otherwise respond to The Ahola Corporations counterclaim to February 10, 2020 - filed by The Bancorp Bank. (Moskow-Schnoll, Beth)
January 2, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Caponi on behalf of Stone Industries, Inc. (Caponi, Steven)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #82 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Stone Industries, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #81 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to January 23, 2020 (Set Briefing Schedule: re #58 MOTION and Memorandum of Law to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Central District of California - Answering Brief due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
January 2, 2020 Filing 82 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Stone Industries, Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
January 2, 2020 Filing 81 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue to January 23, 2020 - filed by The Bancorp Bank. (Moskow-Schnoll, Beth)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #80 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Dun-Rite Sand and Gravel Company answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #77 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Yarmouth Payroll Plus Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #76 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Windsorkent, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #75 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Payroll Control Systems, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #74 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: National Payroll Systems Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #73 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Ameripay, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #65 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise plead in response to the Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apache Homelands, LLC answer due 1/23/2020; Logical Innovations, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020; Logical R-Joint Venture, LLC answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #61 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint for Interpleader to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Automatic Business Computing, LLC answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #60 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: IEM of Florida LLC answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #59 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Segue HR, LLC answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #40 MOTION to Withdraw #26 Notice of Appearance of David E. Wilks and Julie M. O'Dell filed by Advanced Payroll Solutions, LLC. Attorney Julie M. O'Dell and David E. Wilks terminated as to Advanced Payroll Solutions, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2020. (dlw)
December 31, 2019 Filing 80 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME January 23, 2020 to January 23, 2020 - filed by Dun-Rite Sand and Gravel Company. (Gibson, Patrick)
December 31, 2019 Filing 79 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #8 Amended Complaint Answer of Defendant Human Resources, inc to Amended Complaint in Interpleader of The Bancorp Bank by Human Resources Inc..(Reidenberg, Seth)
December 31, 2019 Filing 78 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by The Ahola Corporation. (Meluney, Sean)
December 30, 2019 Filing 77 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Yarmouth Payroll Plus Inc.. (Pross, Christina)
December 30, 2019 Filing 76 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Windsorkent, Inc.. (Pross, Christina)
December 30, 2019 Filing 75 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Payroll Control Systems, Inc.. (Pross, Christina)
December 30, 2019 Filing 74 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by National Payroll Systems Inc.. (Pross, Christina)
December 30, 2019 Filing 73 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Ameripay, Inc.. (Pross, Christina)
December 30, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina J. Pross on behalf of Yarmouth Payroll Plus Inc. (Pross, Christina)
December 30, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina J. Pross on behalf of Windsorkent, Inc. (Pross, Christina)
December 30, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina J. Pross on behalf of Payroll Control Systems, Inc. (Pross, Christina)
December 30, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina J. Pross on behalf of National Payroll Systems Inc. (Pross, Christina)
December 30, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina J. Pross on behalf of Ameripay, Inc. (Pross, Christina)
December 30, 2019 Filing 67 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Check Mate Payroll LLC. (Andrade, Sarah)
December 30, 2019 Filing 66 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #8 Amended Complaint by Check Mate Payroll LLC.(Andrade, Sarah)
December 30, 2019 Filing 65 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise plead in response to the Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Apache Homelands, LLC, Logical Innovations, Inc., Logical R-Joint Venture, LLC. (Harris, John)
December 30, 2019 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Defendant The Ahola Corporations Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint for Interpleader served on Cachet Financial Solutions, Inc. c/o National Registered Agents, Inc. on December 20, 2019, filed by The Ahola Corporation. (Meluney, Sean)
December 30, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Defendant Office of America updated to Payroll Office of America to reflect D.I. #8 Amended Complaint. (amf)
December 30, 2019 Filing 63 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #8 Amended Complaint by Payroll Office of America.(Rowe, Kelly)
December 30, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Elizabeth Rowe on behalf of Payroll Office of America (Rowe, Kelly)
December 30, 2019 Filing 61 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant Automatic Business Computing, LLCs time to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint for Interpleader to January 23, 2020 - filed by Automatic Business Computing, LLC. (Mann, Kevin)
December 30, 2019 Filing 60 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by IEM of Florida LLC. (Tacconelli, Theodore)
December 27, 2019 Filing 59 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Segue HR, LLC. (Uebler, Thomas)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #57 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or Otherwise Plead to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Approved Payroll, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020; Approved Staffing, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020; Associated Human Capital Management, LLC answer due 1/23/2020; Atlantic Utility Trailer Sales, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020; CEOS Corporation answer due 1/23/2020; Charleston Payroll Plus, LLC answer due 1/23/2020; FocusPay Solutions answer due 1/23/2020; Ignite PEO Services, LLC answer due 1/23/2020; Nealis Engineering, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020; Niagara Living LLC answer due 1/23/2020; PR Financial Services, LLC answer due 1/23/2020; Partners in Payroll, LLC answer due 1/23/2020; Payroll Plus, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020; Pizza Ranch Inc. answer due 1/23/2020; Profit Builders Inc. answer due 1/23/2020; Promerio, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020; Reisen Agency, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020; Sammons & Head LLC answer due 1/23/2020; The Reisen Agency, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020; The Spinnaker Condominium Corporation answer due 1/23/2020; W.A. Bragg & Co. answer due 1/23/2020; Workforce Benefit Solutions, LLC answer due 1/23/2020; Zuma Payroll Solutions, LLC answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #56 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Tripco, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #55 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Spectrum Employee Services, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #54 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Payroll Experts LLC answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #53 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Inflection HR LLC answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #52 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Axiom Human Resources Solutions, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #51 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: BeyondPay Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #50 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: PayNorthWest answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #48 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Ken Morton & Sons LLC answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Exponent Technologies, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #46 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Response to Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Pay USA Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #45 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: Answer to Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: JustWorks, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #43 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Harding, Shymanski & Company, PSC answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #38 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Choicepay Payroll & HR Services, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Access1Source-NC, LLC answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Verde Human Capital LLC answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/27/2019. (dlw)
December 26, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION and Memorandum of Law to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Central District of California - filed by Webb Payroll Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed, #2 Certificate of Service (Leoni, Robert) Modified on 12/27/2019 (dlw).
December 26, 2019 Filing 57 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or Otherwise Plead to January 23, 2020 - filed by Approved Payroll, Inc., Approved Staffing, Inc., Associated Human Capital Management, LLC, Atlantic Utility Trailer Sales, Inc., CEOS Corporation, Charleston Payroll Plus, LLC, FocusPay Solutions, Ignite PEO Services, LLC, Nealis Engineering, Inc., Niagara Living LLC, PR Financial Services, LLC, Partners in Payroll, LLC, Payroll Plus Inc., Pizza Ranch Inc., Profit Builders Inc., Promerio, Inc., Reisen Agency, Inc., Sammons & Head LLC, The Reisen Agency, Inc., The Spinnaker Condominium Corporation, W.A. Bragg & Co., Workforce Benefit Solutions, LLC, Zuma Payroll Solutions, LLC. (Green, James)
December 26, 2019 Filing 56 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Tripco, Inc.. (Hazeltine, William)
December 26, 2019 Filing 55 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Spectrum Employee Services, Inc.. (Hazeltine, William)
December 26, 2019 Filing 54 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Payroll Experts LLC. (Hazeltine, William)
December 26, 2019 Filing 53 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Inflection HR LLC. (Hazeltine, William)
December 26, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Axiom Human Resources Solutions, Inc.. (Hazeltine, William)
December 26, 2019 Filing 51 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by BeyondPay Inc.. (Hazeltine, William)
December 24, 2019 Filing 50 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by PayNorthWest. (Nimeroff, Jami)
December 24, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Jami B. Nimeroff on behalf of PayNorthWest (Nimeroff, Jami)
December 24, 2019 Filing 48 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Ken Morton & Sons LLC. (Gibson, Patrick)
December 23, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint - filed by Exponent Technologies, Inc. (Manwaring, Albert) Modified on 12/27/2019 (dlw).
December 23, 2019 Filing 46 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Response to Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Pay USA Inc.. (Brennecke, Sean)
December 23, 2019 Filing 45 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: Answer to Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by JustWorks, Inc.. (Shandler, Chad)
December 23, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Marie Mosley on behalf of JustWorks, Inc. (Mosley, Renee)
December 23, 2019 Filing 43 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Harding, Shymanski & Company, PSC. (Busenkell, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Michael Shandler on behalf of JustWorks, Inc. (Shandler, Chad)
December 23, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #8 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Cachet Financial Services by Infinity HR LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Lisa) Modified on 12/27/2019 (dlw).
December 23, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Withdraw #26 Notice of Appearance of David E. Wilks and Julie M. O'Dell - filed by Advanced Payroll Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Julie) Modified on 12/27/2019 (dlw).
December 23, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Advanced Payroll Services, Inc. re #26 Notice of Appearance (O'Dell, Julie)
December 23, 2019 Filing 38 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Choicepay Payroll & HR Services, Inc.. (Hazeltine, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Access1Source-NC, LLC. (Hazeltine, William)
December 20, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Harris on behalf of Apache Homelands, LLC, Logical Innovations, Inc., Logical R-Joint Venture, LLC (Harris, John)
December 20, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Verde Human Capital LLC. (Higgins, James)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John A. Yanchunis, #31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan B. Cohen filed by Webb Payroll Service Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/20/2019. (dlw)
December 20, 2019 Filing 34 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer of Defendant Advanced Payroll Services, Inc. by Advanced Payroll Services, Inc. re #33 Answer to Amended Complaint (Hughes, Peter) Modified on 12/20/2019 (dlw).
December 20, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #8 Amended Complaint by Advanced Payroll Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hughes, Peter)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Webb Payroll Service Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/20/2019. (dlw)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Clockwork Systems, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/20/2019. (dlw)
December 20, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John A. Yanchunis - filed by Webb Payroll Service Inc.. (Leoni, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan B. Cohen - filed by Webb Payroll Service Inc.. (Leoni, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Webb Payroll Service Inc.. (Leoni, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Clockwork Systems, Inc.. (O'Dell, Julie)
December 20, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Joseph Leoni on behalf of Webb Payroll Service Inc. (Leoni, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Jason Reidenberg on behalf of Human Resources Inc. (Reidenberg, Seth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Wilks on behalf of Advanced Payroll Services, Inc., Advanced Payroll Solutions, LLC, Coastal Payroll Services, Inc. (Wilks, David)
December 19, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #8 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Cachet Financial Services, COUNTERCLAIM against The Bancorp Bank by The Ahola Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Meluney, Sean)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney L. Katherine Boren, Esq. filed by Harding, Shymanski & Company, PSC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/19/2019. (dlw)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to 1/10/2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Wiggins Payroll, Inc. answer due 1/10/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/17/2019. (dlw)
December 17, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney L. Katherine Boren, Esq. - filed by Harding, Shymanski & Company, PSC. (Busenkell, Michael)
December 17, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to 1/10/2020 - filed by Wiggins Payroll, Inc.. (Witherow, Paula)
December 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Custom Payroll Services on 12/17/2019; Ft. Still Apache Industries, LLC on 12/17/2019; G.S. Wilcox & Co. on 12/17/2019; PBI Payroll on 12/17/2019; Polaris Payroll on 12/17/2019; The Human Resources Consulting Group, LLC on 12/17/2019; Tri-State Co-Op on 12/17/2019; Unify Employee Integrated Employee Management on 12/17/2019; Village Bank on 12/17/2019. (lak)
December 17, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to All Quality Machining and Finishing LLC, Associated Human Capital Management, LLC, Charleston Payroll Plus, LLC, Corporate Business Solutions, Mitigation Services, Inc., Quanta HCM, Zuma Payroll Solutions, LLC. (lak)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Payday Payroll Resources, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/16/2019. (dlw)
December 16, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Payday Payroll Resources, Inc. (Aranilla, Artemio) Modified on 12/16/2019 (dlw).
December 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Yelena Boxer for The Ahola Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
December 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kristen-Elise F. DePizzo for The Ahola Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Alpha Payroll Services, LLC answer due 1/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/13/2019. (dlw)
December 13, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Alpha Payroll Services, LLC. (Culver, Donna) Modified on 12/13/2019 (dlw).
December 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Barnaby Grzaslewicz on behalf of Alpha Payroll Services, LLC (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
December 13, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to BeyondPay Inc. on 12/13/2019; Commonwealth Payroll & HR on 12/13/2019; Concept HR on 12/13/2019; E-Z Payroll Services Inc. on 12/13/2019; Fairfield National Bank on 12/13/2019; KAL Enterprise LLC on 12/13/2019; My Strategic Payroll on 12/13/2019; National CPA Payroll LLC on 12/13/2019; PayDayMasters on 12/13/2019; Stirling Services LLC on 12/13/2019; Stone Industries, Inc. on 12/13/2019; TBS Holdings LLC on 12/13/2019; Union Payroll Solutions Inc. on 12/13/2019. (lak)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kristen-Elise F. DePizzo, #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yelena Boxer filed by The Ahola Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/12/2019. (dlw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kristen-Elise F. DePizzo - filed by The Ahola Corporation. (Meluney, Sean)
December 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yelena Boxer - filed by The Ahola Corporation. (Meluney, Sean)
December 11, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Focusit, Inc. (myr)
December 11, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Access1Source-NC, LLC on 12/11/2019; Pay-Tech, Inc. on 12/11/2019; RJDB Enterprises, Inc. on 12/11/2019; Shoto D.C., LLC on 12/11/2019; The UPS Store Atlantic City Convention Center on 12/11/2019. (myr)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION An Order Modifying Service Requirements // Defendant The Ahola Corporation's Motion for Order Modifying Service Requirements Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(C) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion is GRANTED. Defendants' pleadings and replies need not be served on other defendants; any crossclaim, counterclaim, avoidance, or affirmative defense in all defendants' pleadings and replies will be treated as denied or avoided by all other parties; and filing any such pleading and serving it on Plaintiff constitutes notice of the pleadings to all parties. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/11/2019. (dlw) Modified on 12/18/2019 (dlw).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron E. Moore filed by Payday Payroll Resources, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/11/2019. (dlw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron E. Moore - filed by Payday Payroll Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Aranilla, Artemio)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Artemio C. Aranilla, II on behalf of Payday Payroll Resources, Inc. (Aranilla, Artemio)
December 10, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Green Leaf Business Solutions LLC. (myr)
December 10, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to AdvanStaff, Inc. on 12/10/2019; Bent on Better on 12/10/2019; PayRollNW on 12/10/2019; Rolling Hills Country Club, Inc. on 12/10/2019; Total HCM, Inc. on 12/10/2019. (myr)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Service Requirements re #13 MOTION An Order Modidying Service Requirements // Defendant The Ahola Corporation's Motion for Order Modifying Service Requirements Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(C) by The Ahola Corporation. (Meluney, Sean) Modified on 12/10/2019 (dlw).
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION An Order Modidying Service Requirements // Defendant The Ahola Corporation's Motion for Order Modifying Service Requirements Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(C) - filed by The Ahola Corporation. (Meluney, Sean) Modified on 12/10/2019 (dlw).
December 9, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Logical R-Joint Venture, LLC on 12/9/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sam)
December 9, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Employer's Guardian, LLC on 12/9/2019; Great Neck Saw Manufacturers, Inc. on 12/9/2019; Niagara Living LLC on 12/9/2019; PrimePay, LLC on 12/9/2019; Quintana, Lopez, Donoghue & Gonzalez, LLP on 12/9/2019; Restaurant Solutions Inc. on 12/9/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sam)
December 9, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Alpha Payroll Services, LLC, Coastal Payroll Services, Inc. (sam)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Lee Moultrie on behalf of Infinity HR LLC (Moultrie, Samuel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Zwally Brown on behalf of Infinity HR LLC (Brown, Lisa)
December 3, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to 4Free.com, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Managepoint, LLC on 12/3/2019; Office of America on 12/3/2019; P-Five Solutions, LLC on 12/3/2019; Pay Day Payroll, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Pay USA Inc. on 12/3/2019; PayMasters Inc. on 12/3/2019; PayNorthEast LLC on 12/3/2019; PayNorthWest on 12/3/2019; PayPros, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Payright Payroll Services, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Payroll Experts LLC on 12/3/2019; Payroll Link, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Payroll Perfect, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Payroll Services, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Pier Group LLC on 12/3/2019; Pizza Ranch Inc. on 12/3/2019; Plaza Park Family Practice, LLC on 12/3/2019; Polyram Compounds LLC on 12/3/2019; Poseidon Consultants Inc. on 12/3/2019; Quanta LLC on 12/3/2019; Rausch Physical Therapy, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Regional Title Services, LLC on 12/3/2019; Retirement Law Group, Inc. on 12/3/2019; SHS Payroll, LLC on 12/3/2019; ShiftPixy, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Spectrum Employee Services, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Steamline Payroll, LLC on 12/3/2019; TAG Employer Serviices, LLC on 12/3/2019; Tanglewood Golf Course, LLC on 12/3/2019; The People Group on 12/3/2019; The Troxel Company on 12/3/2019; Thyme in the Kitchen LLC on 12/3/2019; Time & Pay Inc. on 12/3/2019; Traverse City Products, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Tripco, Inc. on 11/25/2019; Two Schus Inc. on 12/3/2019; Unify Payroll, LLC on 12/3/2019; Verde Human Capital LLC on 12/3/2019; Vertex Payroll Corp. on 12/3/2019; Vertisource, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Villiams Inc. on 12/3/2019; W.A. Bragg & Co. on 12/3/2019; Welch Printing Company, Inc. on 12/3/2019; William E. Schmidt Foundation Inc. on 12/3/2019; Windsorkent, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Wise Choice, Inc. on 12/3/2019; Workforce Benefit Solutions, LLC on 12/3/2019; and Ziemer, Stayman, Weitzel & Shoulders, LLP on 12/3/2019. (mal)
December 2, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to ASAP Payroll Service, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Accu-Rite Business Services, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Admin HR, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Advanced Compressor Technologies LLC on 12/2/2019; American Payroll Corporation on 12/2/2019; American Time and Labor Company on 12/2/2019; Ameripay, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Apache Homelands, LLC on 12/2/2019; Approved Payroll, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Approved Staffing, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Associated Human Capital Management, LLC on 12/2/2019; Astra Payroll Co. on 12/2/2019; Automatic Business Computing, LLC on 12/2/2019; BEC Enterprises, LLC on 12/2/2019; Balance Point Payroll on 12/2/2019; Bell Ohio, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Bene-Care Payroll, LLC on 12/2/2019; Better Business Bureau Inc. on 12/2/2019; Boys & Girls Club of Evansville, Inc., on 12/2/2019; Business Cents, Inc. on 12/2/2019; CEOS Corporation on 12/2/2019; CPAccounting Solutions Inc. on 12/2/2019; Certified Payroll Associates, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Check Mate Payroll LLC on 12/2/2019; CheckRight, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Civil Search International, LLC on 12/2/2019; Clear Sky Capital Inc. on 12/2/2019; Clockwork Systems, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Comp U.S. Payroll Inc. on 12/2/2019; Corporate Business Solutions on 12/2/2019; David R. Miller, DDS, PC on 12/2/2019; Davis Jewelers Inc. on 12/2/2019; Deaf Bible Society, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Des Dawn Corp/Taxco Payroll Service on 12/2/2019; Dominion Payroll Services, LLC on 12/2/2019; Dragon Projects, LLC on 12/2/2019; Dynamic Human Resources, Inc. on 12/2/2019; E & B Real Estate Services, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Employee Benefits Services, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Employer Services Online, LLC on 12/2/2019; Exponent Technologies, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Eyecare Consultants, LLP on 12/2/2019; Focusit, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Franklin Gringer & Cohen, P.C. on 12/2/2019; Green Leaf Business Solutions LLC on 12/2/2019; Green Payroll Services, Inc. on 12/2/2019; H.R. Management Consultants, Inc. on 12/2/2019; HR 365, LLC on 12/2/2019; HR Ledger, Inc. on 12/2/2019; HR Solutions, LLC on 12/2/2019; Hafer PSC on 12/2/2019; Harding, Shymanski & Company, PSC on 12/2/2019; Hospitality Resource Center on 12/2/2019; Ignite PEO Services, LLC on 12/2/2019; Inflection HR LLC on 12/2/2019; Innovative Payroll Processing, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Intergrity Bookkeeping, LLC on 12/2/2019; JAG Insurance Group, LLC on 12/2/2019; JFPets LLC on 12/2/2019; JustWorks, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Kalter Company Accounting & Consulting Corp. on 12/2/2019; Laise Packaging LLC on 12/2/2019; Levin Corporate Law Group on 12/2/2019; Logical Innovations, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Morton Solar & Wind, LLC on 12/2/2019; NCD Corsillo Plumbing, LLC on 12/2/2019; National Payroll Systems Inc. on 12/2/2019; Nealis Engineering, Inc. on 12/2/2019; Nimbus Inc. on 12/2/2019; OTP Payroll LLC on 12/2/2019; One Point Human Capital Management LLC on 12/2/2019; OnePayHR, LLC on 12/2/2019; Pacific Premier Bank on 12/2/2019; Partners in Payroll, LLC on 12/2/2019; Promerio, Inc. on 12/2/2019. (myr)
November 27, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to 1 Source Business Solutions, LLC on 11/27/2019; Accent Employer Solutions IV, Inc. on 11/27/2019; Accent Employer Solutions, Inc. on 11/27/2019; Accept Solar LLC on 11/27/2019; AccuPay, Inc. on 11/27/2019; All Quality Aluminum Foundry, LLC on 11/27/2019; Barking Mad Grooming, LLC on 11/27/2019; Dekay Fabricators Inc. on 11/27/2019; Delaware Valley Plumbing Supply Inc. on 11/27/2019; Lee Dental Associates, Ltd. on 11/27/2019; Naltrexzone LLC on 11/27/2019; Property Damage Restoration Inc. on 11/27/2019; The Spinnaker Condominium Corporation on 11/27/2019. (sam)
November 27, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Atlantic Utility Trailer Sales, Inc. on 11/27/2019; Deterdings Markets, Inc. on 11/27/2019; Dun-Rite Sand and Gravel Company on 11/27/2019; Ken Morton & Sons LLC on 11/27/2019; Little Scotty Inc. on 11/27/2019; Mitigation Services, Inc. on 11/27/2019; Philadephia Pipe Bending Co. on 11/27/2019; Reisen Agency, Inc. on 11/27/2019; Temptrol Corporation on 11/27/2019; The UPS Store Central Square Shopping Center on 11/27/2019. (myr)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Uebler on behalf of Segue HR, LLC (Uebler, Thomas)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William Anthony Hazeltine on behalf of Choicepay Payroll & HR Services, Inc. (Hazeltine, William)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by The Bancorp Bank. (Attachments: #1 Redline Line of Amended Complaint)(Moskow-Schnoll, Beth)
November 20, 2019 Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $15,799,963.27 (dms,)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding deposit of "Stake." Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/19/2019. (dlw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Beth Moskow-Schnoll, Esq. regarding the amount of the "stake" to be deposited with the Clerk of Court - re 4 Oral Order. (Moskow-Schnoll, Beth)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Anthony Hazeltine on behalf of Access1Source-NC, LLC (Hazeltine, William)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall identify the exact amount of the "stake" (as defined in the #1 Complaint) it seeks to be deposited with the Clerk of Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/14/2019. (dlw)
November 12, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Advanced Payroll Services, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Advanced Payroll Solutions, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Alliance Benefit Group, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Alliance Business Solutions, LLC on 11/12/2019; Alpha Payroll Services, LLC on 11/12/2019; Assethr, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Axiom Human Resources Solutions, Inc. on 11/12/2019; BBCS Payroll, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Cachet Financial Services on 11/12/2019; Charleston Payroll Plus, LLC on 11/12/2019; Choicepay Payroll & HR Services, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Clifton Larson Allen LLP on 11/12/2019; Coastal Payroll Services, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Computersearch Payroll Services on 11/12/2019; Eazepay, LLC on 11/12/2019; Employer Tools and Solutions Inc. on 11/12/2019; Epay Systems, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Focuspay Solutions LLC on 11/12/2019; Hard 8 Acquisitions, LLC on 11/12/2019; Human Resources, Inc. on 11/12/2019; IEM of Florida LLC on 11/12/2019; Igreen Payroll Inc. on 11/12/2019; Infinity HR LLC on 11/12/2019; Infocus Payroll, LLC on 11/12/2019; Integrated Payroll Services, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Integrity Outsource, LLC on 11/12/2019; MM-KMA Investments LLC on 11/12/2019; Management Solutions, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Marathon HR Services, LLC on 11/12/2019; Masspay, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Midsouth Consulting Group on 11/12/2019; Mint Payroll LLC on 11/12/2019; Moneywise Payroll Solutions, Inc. on 11/12/2019; PR Financial Services, LLC on 11/12/2019; PSPay, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Paydata Payroll Services, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Payday Payroll Resources, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Paylogic on 11/12/2019; Paymedia, LLC on 11/12/2019; Payroll Control Systems, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Payroll Ease LLC on 11/12/2019; Payroll Logix, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Payroll Plus, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Payroll Solutions, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Paysource, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Profit Builders Inc. on 11/12/2019; Sammons & Head LLC on 11/12/2019; Segue HR, LLC on 11/12/2019; Shepherd Business Solutions, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Shift Human Capital Management, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Simplified Employer Solutions, LLC on 11/12/2019; Solex Payroll Systems, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Solid Business Solutions, LLC on 11/12/2019; Sourceone Payroll Services on 11/12/2019; Southeastern Employee Benefits Group, Inc. on 11/12/2019; The Ahola Corporation on 11/12/2019; Triangle Payroll Services, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Tripco, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Valiant Payroll Services, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Webb Payroll Service Inc. on 11/12/2019; Wiggins Payroll, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Yarmouth Payroll Plus Inc. on 11/12/2019; Zuma Payroll Solutions, LLC on 11/12/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
November 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 4, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent The Bancorp, Inc. for The Bancorp Bank filed by The Bancorp Bank. (kmd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Advanced Payroll Services, Inc., Advanced Payroll Solutions, Inc., Alliance Benefit Group, Inc., Alliance Business Solutions, LLC, Alpha Payroll Services, LLC, Assethr, Inc., Axiom Human Resources Solutions, Inc., BBCS Payroll, Inc., Bene-Care Payroll, LLC, Cachet Financial Services, Charleston Payroll Plus, LLC, Choicepay Payroll & HR Services, Inc., Clifton Larson Allen LLP, Coastal Payroll Services, Inc., Computersearch Payroll Services, Custom Payroll Services, Eazepay, LLC, Employer Tools and Solutions Inc., Epay Systems, Inc., Focuspay Solutions LLC, Hard 8 Acquisitions, LLC, Human Resources, Inc., IEM of Florida LLC, Igreen Payroll Inc., Infinity HR LLC, Infocus Payroll, LLC, Integrated Payroll Services, Inc., Integrity Outsource, LLC, MM-KMA Investments LLC, Management Solutions, Inc., Marathon HR Services, LLC, Masspay, Inc., Midsouth Consulting Group, Mint Payroll LLC, Moneywise Payroll Solutions, Inc., PR Financial Services, LLC, PSPay, Inc., Paydata Payroll Services, Inc., Payday Payroll Resources, Inc., Paylogic, Paymedia, LLC, Payroll Control Systems, Inc., Payroll Ease LLC, Payroll Logix, Inc., Payroll Plus, Inc., Payroll Solutions, Inc., Paysource, Inc., Profit Builders Inc., RJDB Enterprises, Inc., Sammons & Head LLC, Segue HR, LLC, Shepherd Business Solutions, Inc., Shift Human Capital Management, Inc., Simplified Employer Solutions, LLC, Solex Payroll Systems, Inc., Solid Business Solutions, LLC, Sourceone Payroll Services, Southeastern Employee Benefits Group, Inc., Syndeo Outsourcing, LLC, The Ahola Corporation, Timepay$ Corporation, Triangle Payroll Services, Inc., Tripco, Inc., Valiant Payroll Services, Inc., Webb Payroll Service Inc., Wiggins Payroll, Inc., Yarmouth Payroll Plus Inc., Zuma Payroll Solutions, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2770709.) - filed by The Bancorp Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bancorp Bank v. Advanced Payroll Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zuma Payroll Solutions, LLC
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payroll Logix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiggins Payroll, Inc.
Represented By: Paula C. Witherow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focuspay Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payroll Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston Payroll Plus, LLC
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valiant Payroll Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Payroll Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Benefit Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moneywise Payroll Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solex Payroll Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MM-KMA Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choicepay Payroll & HR Services, Inc.
Represented By: William Anthony Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammons & Head LLC
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midsouth Consulting Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assethr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timepay$ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paydata Payroll Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Payroll Services, Inc.
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Represented By: David E. Wilks
Represented By: Peter C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Profit Builders Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Human Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSPay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Outsource, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mint Payroll LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webb Payroll Service Inc.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Leoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paysource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bene-Care Payroll, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon HR Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBCS Payroll, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triangle Payroll Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shift Human Capital Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Payroll Services, LLC
Represented By: Barnaby Grzaslewicz
Represented By: Donna Lynn Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masspay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eazepay, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Segue HR, LLC
Represented By: Hayley M. Lenahan
Represented By: Thomas A. Uebler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computersearch Payroll Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplified Employer Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solid Business Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Payroll Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igreen Payroll Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payday Payroll Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Artemio C. Aranilla, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paylogic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IEM of Florida LLC
Represented By: Theodore J. Tacconelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cachet Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axiom Human Resources Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: William Anthony Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Business Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payroll Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarmouth Payroll Plus Inc.
Represented By: Christina J. Pross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epay Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifton Larson Allen LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paymedia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PR Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ahola Corporation
Represented By: Yelena Boxer
Represented By: Sean A. Meluney
Represented By: Kristen-Elise F. DePizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Employee Benefits Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infocus Payroll, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shepherd Business Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tripco, Inc.
Represented By: William Anthony Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sourceone Payroll Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payroll Control Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Christina J. Pross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Payroll Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJDB Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employer Tools and Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity HR LLC
Represented By: Samuel Lee Moultrie
Represented By: Lisa Zwally Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payroll Ease LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Payroll Services, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Wilks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hard 8 Acquisitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndeo Outsourcing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payroll Link, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Park Family Practice, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steamline Payroll, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.S. Wilcox & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Check Mate Payroll LLC
Represented By: Sarah Theresa Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payroll Experts LLC
Represented By: William Anthony Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic Business Computing, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ignite PEO Services, LLC
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unify Employee Integrated Employee Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalter Company Accounting & Consulting Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pay-Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEOS Corporation
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unify Payroll, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-State Co-Op
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayRollNW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Valley Plumbing Supply Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Source Business Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dun-Rite Sand and Gravel Company
Represented By: Patrick K. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate Business Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTP Payroll LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertisource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workforce Benefit Solutions, LLC
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clockwork Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoto D.C., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Homelands, LLC
Represented By: John G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Payroll Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton Solar & Wind, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.R. Management Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logical Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: John G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AdvanStaff, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset HR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ft. Still Apache Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ShiftPixy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focusit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertex Payroll Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admin HR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HR Ledger, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Z Payroll Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPros, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAL Enterprise LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National CPA Payroll LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payroll Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bent on Better
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laise Packaging LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitality Resource Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Cents, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HR Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hafer PSC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Strategic Payroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intergrity Bookkeeping, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deterdings Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Reisen Agency, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsorkent, Inc.
Represented By: Christina J. Pross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nealis Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Gringer & Cohen, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Payroll Processing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Promerio, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reisen Agency, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employer Services Online, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanglewood Golf Course, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEC Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Spinnaker Condominium Corporation
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accu-Rite Business Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pier Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pay USA Inc.
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragon Projects, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total HCM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pizza Ranch Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Des Dawn Corp/Taxco Payroll Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Payroll & HR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mass Pay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanta LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Morton & Sons LLC
Represented By: Patrick K. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara Living LLC
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HR 365, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employer's Guardian, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynamic Human Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkshore Resort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Schus Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CheckRight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Payroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ziemer, Stayman, Weitzel & Shoulders, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verde Human Capital LLC
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civil Search International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHS Payroll, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payroll Plus Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRDisburse-Managepoint, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welch Printing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAG Employer Serviices, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exponent Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Albert H. Manwaring, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accent Employer Solutions IV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The UPS Store Central Square Shopping Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certified Payroll Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPAccounting Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Managepoint, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accent Employer Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dekay Fabricators Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Payroll Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Represented By: David E. Wilks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Dental Associates, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Employee Services, Inc.
Represented By: William Anthony Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traverse City Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolling Hills Country Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OnePayHR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pay Day Payroll, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payroll Perfect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBI Payroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FocusPay Solutions
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boys & Girls Club of Evansville, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayDayMasters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Quality Aluminum Foundry, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rausch Physical Therapy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Sky Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Scotty Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JustWorks, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Michael Shandler
Represented By: Renee Marie Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Payroll Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quintana, Lopez, Donoghue & Gonzalez, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approved Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temptrol Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payright Payroll Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villiams Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poseidon Consultants Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCD Corsillo Plumbing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approved Payroll, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E & B Real Estate Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restaurant Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harding, Shymanski & Company, PSC
Represented By: Michael Busenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic City Convention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Premier Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thyme in the Kitchen LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathi's Check Mate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyecare Consultants, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Neck Saw Manufacturers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Damage Restoration Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayNorthWest
Represented By: Jami B. Nimeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inflection HR LLC
Represented By: William Anthony Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAG Insurance Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Business Bureau Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameripay, Inc.
Represented By: Christina J. Pross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASAP Payroll Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wise Choice, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Payroll Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employee Benefits Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logical R-Joint Venture, LLC
Represented By: John G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Miller, DDS, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naltrexzone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra Payroll Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P-Five Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JFPets LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comp U.S. Payroll Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitigation Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4Free.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accept Solar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Human Resources Inc.
Represented By: Seth Jason Reidenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Leaf Business Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Human Resources Consulting Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stirling Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concept HR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayNorthEast LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Human Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Quality Machining and Finishing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time & Pay Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Schmidt Foundation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Troxel Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retirement Law Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polyram Compounds LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Time and Labor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayMasters Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Payroll Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Title Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.A. Bragg & Co.
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levin Corporate Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barking Mad Grooming, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nimbus Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Compressor Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The UPS Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadephia Pipe Bending Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners in Payroll, LLC
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balance Point Payroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Utility Trailer Sales, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AccuPay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BeyondPay Inc.
Represented By: William Anthony Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Payroll Systems Inc.
Represented By: Christina J. Pross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deaf Bible Society, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access1Source-NC, LLC
Represented By: William Anthony Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Point Human Capital Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanta HCM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimePay, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Jewelers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The UPS Store Atlantic City Convention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payroll Office of America
Represented By: Marc Stephen Casarino
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verde Human Capital LLC d/b/a OneMint
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JFPets LLC d/b/a Pet Supplies Plus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hard 8 Acquisitions, LLC d/b/a Launch Payroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tripco, Inc. d/b/aPayRite
Represented By: William Anthony Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clockwork Systems, Inc. d/b/a APS
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertisource, Inc. d/b/a Vertisource HR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Promerio, Inc. d/b/a California Payroll
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEOS Corporation d/b/a TimePays Corporation
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computersearch Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payroll Success Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accu-Rite Business Services, Inc. d/b/a Accu-Rite Payroll Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bancorp Bank
Represented By: William J. Burton
Represented By: Beth Moskow-Schnoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?