Wang v. Achillion Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elaine Wang
Defendant: Frank Verwiel, Nicole Vitullo, Achillion Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Joseph Truitt, Jason S. Fisherman, David I. Scheer, Robert L. Van Nostrand, Michael D. Kishbauch and Kurt Graves
Case Number: 1:2019cv02104
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #5 . (nms)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Elaine Wang (Long, Brian)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Achillion Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Larkin, Joseph)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph O. Larkin on behalf of Achillion Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jason S. Fisherman, Kurt Graves, Michael D. Kishbauch, David I. Scheer, Joseph Truitt, Robert L. Van Nostrand, Frank Verwiel, Nicole Vitullo (Larkin, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02104-RGA, 1:19-cv-02112-RGA (rjb)
November 7, 2019 No Summons Issued. (myr)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF SECTIONS 14(a) AND 20(a) OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 filed with Jury Demand against Achillion Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jason S. Fisherman, Kurt Graves, Michael D. Kishbauch, David I. Scheer, Joseph Truitt, Robert L. Van Nostrand, Frank Verwiel, Nicole Vitullo - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2772800.) - filed by Elaine Wang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Achillion Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Verwiel
Represented By: Joseph O. Larkin
Represented By: Ronald N. Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Vitullo
Represented By: Joseph O. Larkin
Represented By: Ronald N. Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Achillion Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph O. Larkin
Represented By: Ronald N. Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Truitt
Represented By: Joseph O. Larkin
Represented By: Ronald N. Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason S. Fisherman
Represented By: Joseph O. Larkin
Represented By: Ronald N. Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David I. Scheer
Represented By: Joseph O. Larkin
Represented By: Ronald N. Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Van Nostrand
Represented By: Joseph O. Larkin
Represented By: Ronald N. Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Kishbauch
Represented By: Joseph O. Larkin
Represented By: Ronald N. Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Graves
Represented By: Joseph O. Larkin
Represented By: Ronald N. Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Wang
Represented By: Brian D. Long
Represented By: Gina M. Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?