AstraZeneca AB et al v. Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB and Nektar Therapeutics
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02113
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Nektar Therapeutics.(Silver, Daniel)
December 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Aaron P. Maurer for AstraZeneca AB, for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, for Nektar Therapeutics added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
December 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sumeet P. Dang for AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Nektar Therapeutics added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessamyn S. Berniker, Aaron P. Maurer, Sumeet P. Dang, filed by Nektar Therapeutics, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/11/2019. (nms)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessamyn S. Berniker, Aaron P. Maurer, Sumeet P. Dang - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Nektar Therapeutics. (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 12/11/2019 (nms).
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aurobindo Pharma Limited for Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Nektar Therapeutics, by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 12/2/2019 (nms).
November 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AstraZeneca AB, Nektar Therapeutics, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Silver, Daniel)
November 8, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. on 11/8/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Primecap Management Company, Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Corporate Parent Fidelity Management and Research LLC for Nektar Therapeutics filed by Nektar Therapeutics. (kmd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (kmd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,012,469. (kmd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 9/26/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: 4/4/2032. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 3/26/2022. (kmd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2774629.) - filed by AstraZeneca AB, Nektar Therapeutics, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AstraZeneca AB et al v. Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Sumeet P. Dang
Represented By: Aaron P. Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca AB
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Sumeet P. Dang
Represented By: Aaron P. Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nektar Therapeutics
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Sumeet P. Dang
Represented By: Aaron P. Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?