Asamoah et al v. JNJ Express, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Asamoah, Patrick K. Owusu, The Estate of RAO, Bethany Frankel and Lisa Frankel
Defendant: JNJ Express, Inc. and Brian Keith Winningham
Case Number: 1:2019cv02119
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Complaint (without prejudice) - filed by JNJ Express, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Callaway, Justin)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case by Lisa Frankel, Bethany Frankel (Lengkeek, Timothy)
December 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Judson Waltman for Linda Asamoah, for Patrick K. Owusu, and for The Estate of RAO added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
December 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lawrence P. Wilson for Linda Asamoah, and for Patrick K. Owusu, and for The Estate of RAO added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Linda Asamoah, The Estate of RAO, Patrick K. Owusu: For Brian Keith Winningham waiver sent on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/20/2020. (Dalton, Andrew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Linda Asamoah, The Estate of RAO, Patrick K. Owusu: For JNJ Express, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/20/2020. (Dalton, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 The pdf of D.I. #8 has been replaced with a corrected version per request of filer. (nmf)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Arnold E. Capriotti, Jr., as attorney for JNJ Express, INC on November 18, 2019 by Linda Asamoah, Patrick K. Owusu, The Estate of RAO. Waiver of Service due by 12/18/2019. (Dalton, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Arnold E. Capriotti, Jr., as attorney for Brian Keith Winningham on November 18, 2019 by Linda Asamoah, Patrick K. Owusu, The Estate of RAO. Waiver of Service due by 12/18/2019. (Dalton, Andrew) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/20/2019) (nmf, ).
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by JNJ Express, Inc., Brian Keith Winningham. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Callaway, Justin)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Callaway on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Callaway, Justin)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney W. Mark Lanier filed by Linda Asamoah, Patrick K. Owusu, The Estate of RAO, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lawrence P. Wilson filed by Linda Asamoah, Patrick K. Owusu, The Estate of RAO, #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Judson Waltman filed by Linda Asamoah, Patrick K. Owusu, The Estate of RAO. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/14/2019. (fms)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney W. Mark Lanier - filed by Linda Asamoah, Patrick K. Owusu, The Estate of RAO. (Dalton, Andrew)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lawrence P. Wilson - filed by Linda Asamoah, Patrick K. Owusu, The Estate of RAO. (Dalton, Andrew)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Judson Waltman - filed by Linda Asamoah, Patrick K. Owusu, The Estate of RAO. (Dalton, Andrew)
November 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 12, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Clerk's Office replaced Plaintiff's Complaint with a redacted version. (myr)
November 12, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Clerk's Office placed Plaintiff's Complaint under temporary seal until a redacted version can be swapped (Minors names need to be redacted. Use Initials only.). (rwc)
November 12, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to JNJ Express, Inc. on 11/12/2019; Brian Keith Winningham on 11/12/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against JNJ Express, Inc., Brian Keith Winningham - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2775955.) - filed by The Estate of RAO, Linda Asamoah, Patrick K. Owusu. (Additional attachment(s) : #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (myr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asamoah et al v. JNJ Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Asamoah
Represented By: Andrew Caulfield Dalton
Represented By: Bartholomew J. Dalton
Represented By: Judson Waltman
Represented By: Lawrence P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick K. Owusu
Represented By: Andrew Caulfield Dalton
Represented By: Bartholomew J. Dalton
Represented By: Judson Waltman
Represented By: Lawrence P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of RAO
Represented By: Andrew Caulfield Dalton
Represented By: Bartholomew J. Dalton
Represented By: Judson Waltman
Represented By: Lawrence P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Frankel
Represented By: Timothy E. Lengkeek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Frankel
Represented By: Timothy E. Lengkeek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JNJ Express, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Keith Winningham
Represented By: Justin Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?