Young v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Eileen Young
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02145
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co.: For Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co. waiver sent on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020. (Cline, Joanna)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co. filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co.. (Cline, Joanna)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna J. Cline on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co. (Cline, Joanna)
November 25, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to plaintiff's counsel on 11/25/2019. (amf)
November 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 15, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co. on 11/15/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2780199) - filed by Eileen Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co.
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Young
Represented By: Marc H. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?