Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Sonim Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Defendant: Sonim Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02150
Filed: November 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 2/21/20 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Sonim Technologies, Inc. answer due 2/21/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/11/2019. (dlw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 2/21/20 - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) Modified on 12/11/2019 (dlw).
November 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 18, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sonim Technologies, Inc. on 11/18/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
November 17, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (kmd)
November 17, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. RE44,199 E. (kmd)
November 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
November 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Infringement of Patent filed with Jury Demand against Sonim Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2780772.) - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Related Cases)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Sonim Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Represented By: Jimmy C. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonim Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?