Dunlap v. Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Tara Dunlap
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02153
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 Letter to Judge Connolly from Tara Dunlap regarding proof of service of complaint and request for hearing - re #5 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(kmd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Jarret P. Hitchings regarding the Order dated December 30, 2019 - re #4 Order,, Set Deadlines,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hitchings, Jarret)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Letter. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's letter (D.1. #3 ) and its statement pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 on or before Thursday, January 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/30/2019. (fms)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Judge Connolly from Tara Dunlap requesting a hearing. (kmd)
November 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 18, 2019 Remark: Copy of docket sheet sent to pro se Plaintiff. (amf)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from JP Court No. 13, Case Number JP13-19-004565 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2781414)- filed by Santander Consumer USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunlap v. Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Represented By: Jarret P. Hitchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?