Fonk v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Fonk
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), National Association and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02169
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juliana S. Clay filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/10/2020. (ntl)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juliana S. Clay - filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to February 10, 2020 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/8/2020. (ntl)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to February 10, 2020 - filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement as to Capital One Bank (USA), National Association by Dawn Fonk (Garibian, Antranig)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Fonk. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Garibian, Antranig)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits served on Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. on 12/20/2019, filed by Dawn Fonk. (Garibian, Antranig)
November 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 21, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to Philadelphia Office per filing party's request. (myr)
November 21, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Capital One Bank (USA), National Association on 11/21/2019; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 11/21/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Capital One Bank (USA), National Association, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2785238.) - filed by Dawn Fonk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fonk v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Fonk
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?