Pivital IP LLC v. ActiveCampaign, LLC
Plaintiff: Pivital IP LLC
Defendant: ActiveCampaign, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02176
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 27, 2020 filed by Pivital IP LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/12/19. (ntl)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 27, 2020 - filed by Pivital IP LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 5, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for Pivital IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02175-LPS, 1:19-cv-02176-LPS, 1:19-cv-02177-LPS. (kmd)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett filed by Pivital IP LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/4/19. (ntl)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Pivital IP LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pivital IP LLC. ActiveCampaign, LLC served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02175-LPS, 1:19-cv-02176-LPS, 1:19-cv-02177-LPS (rjb)
November 22, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to ActiveCampaign, LLC on 11/22/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sam)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Pivital IP LLC. (sam)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,636,965 B1 (sam)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against ActiveCampaign, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2785709.) - filed by Pivital IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pivital IP LLC v. ActiveCampaign, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pivital IP LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ActiveCampaign, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?