Frankel et al v. JNJ Express, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Frankel and Bethany Frankel
Defendant: JNJ Express, Inc. and Brian Keith Winningham
Case Number: 1:2019cv02186
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 Letter to Judge Connolly from Timothy Lengkeek regarding Oral Order of January 22, 2020 - re Oral Order,, Set Hearings,. (Lengkeek, Timothy)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Rescheduling Hearings: The Scheduling Conference is rescheduled to be held with related Civil Action No. 19-2119-CFC on 2/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/22/2020. (nmf)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 Letter to Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Justin P. Callaway, Esq., regarding Scheduling Conference scheduled on 1/24/20. (Callaway, Justin)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Arnold E. Capriotti, Esq. filed by JNJ Express, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/13/2020. (fms)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Arnold E. Capriotti, Esq. - filed by JNJ Express, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Service)(Callaway, Justin)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. If the parties have no disputes about the scheduling order, the Court will not require the parties to appear at a conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/20/2019. (nmf)
December 9, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by Bethany Frankel, Lisa Frankel (Lengkeek, Timothy)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by JNJ Express, Inc.. (Callaway, Justin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JNJ Express, Inc., Brian Keith Winningham.(Callaway, Justin)
November 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N19C-10-211 SKR (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2787202)- filed by JNJ Express, Inc., Brian Keith Winningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frankel et al v. JNJ Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JNJ Express, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Keith Winningham
Represented By: Justin Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Frankel
Represented By: Timothy E. Lengkeek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Frankel
Represented By: Timothy E. Lengkeek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?