Scalia v. Local 1694, International Longshoremen's Association,
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Defendant: Local 1694, International Longshoremen's Association,
Case Number: 1:2019cv02235
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:0401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathleen Bichner, filed by Local 1694, International Longshoremen's Association,. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2020. (nms)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathleen Bichner - filed by Local 1694, International Longshoremen's Association,. (Geren, Lance)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance M. Geren on behalf of Local 1694, International Longshoremen's Association, (Geren, Lance)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER: The Motion for Pro Hac Vice (D.I. #5 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renew. Certifications signed by counsel need to be dated as to the day they were signed. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2020. (nms)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathleen Bichner - filed by Local 1694, International Longshoremen's Association,. (Geren, Lance)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance M. Geren on behalf of Local 1694, International Longshoremen's Association, (Geren, Lance)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Eugene Scalia: For Local 1694, International Longshoremen's Association, waiver sent on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020. (Wenger, Jesse)
December 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 6, 2019 No Summons Issued. (apk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Local 1694, International Longshoremen's Association, - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Fee Waived) - filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Local 1694, International Longshoremen's Association,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 1694, International Longshoremen's Association,
Represented By: Lance M. Geren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: David C. Weiss
Represented By: Jesse S. Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?