Volterra Semiconductor LLC, v. Monolithic Power Systems, INC.
Plaintiff: Volterra Semiconductor LLC,
Defendant: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02240
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint to February 28, 2020 filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. answer due 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/27/2020. (fms)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint to February 28, 2020 - filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney David M. Barkan for Volterra Semiconductor LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lionel M. Lavenue - filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 29, 2020 - filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 29, 2020 filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. answer due 1/29/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/30/2019. (fms)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lionel M. Lavenue for Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lionel M. Lavenue filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/30/2019. (fms)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Elizabeth Keller on behalf of Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. (Keller, Karen)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David M. Barkan - filed by Volterra Semiconductor LLC,. (Oakes, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David M. Barkan filed by Volterra Semiconductor LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/13/2019. (fms)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Volterra Semiconductor LLC,. Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Oakes, Robert)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Maxim Integrated Products, Inc. for Volterra Semiconductor LLC, filed by Volterra Semiconductor LLC,. (apk)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,362,986 ;US 7,525,408 ;US 7,772,955. (apk)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Monolithic Power Systems, INC. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2796597.) - filed by Volterra Semiconductor LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, # 5 Patent/Trademark Report)(apk)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Monolithic Power Systems, INC. on 12/9/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volterra Semiconductor LLC, v. Monolithic Power Systems, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Lionel M. Lavenue
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Andrew Russell
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volterra Semiconductor LLC,
Represented By: Robert M. Oakes
Represented By: David M. Barkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?