In re: PWR Invest, LP et al
Appellant: Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc. and PWR Invest, LP
Appellee: Chambers Energy Management, LP and Office of the United States Trustee
Debtor: PWR INVEST, LP, et al.,
Case Number: 1:2019cv02255
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #2 has been replaced with a corrected version. (rwc)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/21/20. (cak)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gerrit M. Pronske, filed by Oklahoma Merge, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc., Oklahoma River Basin, LP, Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, PWR Invest, LP, and #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason P. Kathman, filed by Oklahoma Merge, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc., Oklahoma River Basin, LP, Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, PWR Invest, LP. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/13/2020. (nms)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason P. Kathman - filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, PWR Invest, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Collins, Kevin)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gerrit M. Pronske - filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, PWR Invest, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Collins, Kevin)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Pursuant to this Courts Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court under to 28 U.S.C. 158; IT IS ORDERED that a teleconference has been scheduled for Wednesday, January 15, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. Eastern Time with Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge related to the screening process for mediation. Counsel for appellant shall initiate the teleconference call. Local counsel are reminded of their obligations to inform out-of-state counsel of this Order. To avoid the imposition of sanctions, counsel shall advise the Court immediately of any problems regarding compliance with this Order. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/13/20. (cak)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey T. Mispagel of Latham & Watkins, filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/9/2020. (nms)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey T. Mispagel of Latham & Watkins - filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP. (Hitchings, Jarret)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam J. Goldberg, filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP, and #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Reiss, filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2019. (nms)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Reiss - filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP. (Hitchings, Jarret)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam J. Goldberg - filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP. (Lastowski, Michael)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Lastowski on behalf of Chambers Energy Management, LP (Lastowski, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Thursday, January 9, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/12/19. (cak)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (apk) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/31/2020) (rwc).
December 11, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (apk)
December 11, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (apk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 11/26/2019 by Honorable John T. Dorsey in Bankruptcy case number 19-11164. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, PWR Invest, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: PWR Invest, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP
Represented By: David M. Powlen
Represented By: Kevin Grant Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Oklahoma Merge, LP
Represented By: David M. Powlen
Represented By: Kevin Grant Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Oklahoma River Basin, LP
Represented By: David M. Powlen
Represented By: Kevin Grant Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Powlen
Represented By: Kevin Grant Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PWR Invest, LP
Represented By: David M. Powlen
Represented By: Kevin Grant Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chambers Energy Management, LP
Represented By: Michael R. Lastowski
Represented By: Jarret P. Hitchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Office of the United States Trustee
Represented By: Linda Richenderfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PWR INVEST, LP, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?